Hawksley v. New Penn Motor Express, LLC
Plaintiff: Gregory Hawksley
Defendant: New Penn Motor Express, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv01459
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L Bryant
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Stipulation of Dismissal until 12/11/2020. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 11/20/2020. (Nault, James)
November 19, 2020 Filing 22 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until 12/11/2020 to File Stipulation of Dismissal by New Penn Motor Express, LLC. (Bisbee, Lincoln)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER denying #19 Motion for Extension of Time as moot in light of the Court's Dkt. 20 Order Dismissing Case without prejudice. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 10/28/2020. (Nault, James)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DISMISSING CASE as settled. The parties report that "[t]he Parties have proactively engaged in extensive settlement discussions. As a result of these discussions, the Parties have agreed, in principle, to resolve Plaintiff's claims," and that "the Parties intend on filing a stipulation of dismissal." Dkt. 19 at 2. Rather than continue to keep the case open on the docket, the Clerk is directed to terminate this file without prejudice to any party filing a motion to reopen the case on or before 11/20/2020. If the parties wish to file a stipulation of dismissal (for approval by the Court or simply for inclusion in the Court's file), they may do so on or before 11/20/2020. The dates set forth in this order may be extended for good cause in accordance with Local Rule 7(b). Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 10/28/2020. (Nault, James)
October 28, 2020 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Shafer, J.)
October 27, 2020 Filing 19 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until 11/20/2020 to Respond to Plaintiff's #18 Amended Complaint by New Penn Motor Express, LLC. (Bisbee, Lincoln)
October 16, 2020 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT AS OF RIGHT against New Penn Motor Express, LLC, filed by Gregory Hawksley.(McMinn, Michael)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Attorney Lincoln O. Bisbee to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 10/15/2020. (Velez, F.)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #5 MOTION to Dismiss until 11/16/2020. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 10/14/2020. (Nault, James)
October 13, 2020 Filing 15 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply WITH CONSENT as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss until Nov. 16, 2020 by Gregory Hawksley. (McMinn, Michael)
October 9, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Attorney(s) Lincoln O. Bisbee to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by New Penn Motor Express, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Lincoln O. Bisbee, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(D'Agostino, Michael)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice without prejudice to re-filing. D. Conn. Local Civil Rules require "an affidavit, duly sworn and executed by the proposed visiting attorney," "identifying the bar of each court of which said attorney is and has ever been a member, and the corresponding bar identification number(s); or if no such numbers have been assigned, so stating." D. Conn. L. Civ. R. 83.1(d)(1)(b) (emphasis added). The Local Rules are strictly construed. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 10/6/2020. (Nault, James)
October 2, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Attorney(s) Lincoln O. Bisbee to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6133774) by New Penn Motor Express, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affiidavit of Lincoln O. Bisbee, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(D'Agostino, Michael)
September 30, 2020 Filing 11 Amended Corporate Disclosure Statement by New Penn Motor Express, LLC identifying Corporate Parent YRC Worldwide, Inc. for New Penn Motor Express, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Daniel Schmidt)(D'Agostino, Michael)
September 28, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #7 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Notice (Other) filed by New Penn Motor Express, LLC, #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by New Penn Motor Express, LLC, #8 Standing Protective Order, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by New Penn Motor Express, LLC, #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by New Penn Motor Express, LLC, #3 Notice (Other) filed by New Penn Motor Express, LLC, #9 Order Re: Chambers Practices, #6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines. Signed by Clerk on 9/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order) (Velez, F.)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 9/25/2020. (Velez, F.)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 9/25/2020. (Velez, F.)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 9/25/2020. (Velez, F.)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/24/2020; Discovery due by 3/27/2021; Dispositive Motions due by 5/1/2021. Signed by Clerk on 9/25/2020. (Velez, F.)
September 25, 2020 Judge Vanessa L. Bryant added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
September 25, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by New Penn Motor Express, LLC.Responses due by 10/16/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - CBA Excerpts)(D'Agostino, Michael)
September 25, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by New Penn Motor Express, LLC identifying Corporate Parent YRC Worldwide, Inc. for New Penn Motor Express, LLC. (D'Agostino, Michael)
September 25, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by New Penn Motor Express, LLC of Pending Motions (D'Agostino, Michael)
September 25, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by New Penn Motor Express, LLC of Compliance with Standing Order on Removed Cases (D'Agostino, Michael)
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by New Penn Motor Express, LLC from Superior Court of the State of Connecticut Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-6119384, filed by New Penn Motor Express, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons, Complaint, Aff of Service, #2 Exhibit B - Proof of Service, #3 Exhibit C - Schmidt Declaration, #4 Exhibit C-1 - CBA Excerpts, #5 Exhibit C-2 - Blackline CBA, #6 Exhibit D - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(D'Agostino, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hawksley v. New Penn Motor Express, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Hawksley
Represented By: Michael C. McMinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Penn Motor Express, LLC
Represented By: Michael C. D'Agostino
Represented By: Lincoln Owens Bisbee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?