Parent v. Foster et al
Plaintiff: Eric Parent
Defendant: Brian Foster and ABF Freight System, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01470
Filed: September 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ABF Freight System, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent ArcBest Corporation, Corporate Parent ABF, Inc. for ABF Freight System, Inc.. (Kenney, Michael)
October 1, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE re #5 Electronic Service Documents, Response to 5-1 - Standing Order for Cases Removed from Superior Court filed by ABF Freight System, Inc., Brian Foster. (Kenney, Michael)
October 1, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by ABF Freight System, Inc., Brian Foster Statement of no Pending Motions (Kenney, Michael)
September 29, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by Brian Foster, ABF Freight System, Inc., #4 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 09/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order)(Fazekas, J.)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 09/28/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 09/28/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/27/2020. Discovery due by 3/30/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 5/4/2021. Signed by Clerk on 09/28/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
September 28, 2020 Judge Kari A. Dooley added. (Oliver, T.)
September 28, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ABF Freight System, Inc., Brian Foster from Connecticut Superior Court, J.D. of Fairfield at Bridgeport, case number FBT-CV20-6100503-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-6122417, filed by ABF Freight System, Inc., Brian Foster. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Summons, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Removal Filed in State Court)(Kenney, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/29/2020: #4 State Court Complaint) (Walker, J.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parent v. Foster et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Foster
Represented By: Michael P. Kenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABF Freight System, Inc.
Represented By: Michael P. Kenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Parent
Represented By: Robert James Weber, III.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?