Open Communities Alliance et al v. Carson et al
Plaintiff: Open Communities Alliance and SouthCoast Fair Housing
Defendant: Ben Carson and Department of Housing and Urban Development
Case Number: 3:2020cv01587
Filed: October 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet Bond Arterton
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint, on consent, to 1/15/21. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 12/17/20. (Tooker, Aimee)
December 18, 2020 Answer deadline updated for All Defendants. (Tooker, Aimee)
December 17, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie G. Turbert on behalf of Ben Carson, Department of Housing and Urban Development (Turbert, Julie)
December 17, 2020 Filing 26 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until 01/15/2021 to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Ben Carson, Department of Housing and Urban Development. (Rosen-Shaud, Brian)
December 17, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian C. Rosen-Shaud on behalf of Ben Carson, Department of Housing and Urban Development (Rosen-Shaud, Brian)
November 12, 2020 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Open Communities Alliance, SouthCoast Fair Housing. Ben Carson served on 10/26/2020, answer due 12/25/2020; Department of Housing and Urban Development served on 10/26/2020, answer due 12/25/2020. (Barrett, Dan)
November 12, 2020 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Open Communities Alliance, SouthCoast Fair Housing. (Bildner, Elana)
November 10, 2020 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #4 MOTION for Attorney(s) Sandra S. Park, Sarah E. Watson, Thomas S. Silverstein, Brian C. Corman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $800 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6173339) by Open Communities Alliance, SouthCoast Fair Housing. (Watson, Sarah)
November 10, 2020 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #4 MOTION for Attorney(s) Sandra S. Park, Sarah E. Watson, Thomas S. Silverstein, Brian C. Corman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $800 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6173339) by Open Communities Alliance, SouthCoast Fair Housing. (Silverstein, Thomas)
October 29, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsey Kaley on behalf of Open Communities Alliance, SouthCoast Fair Housing (Kaley, Lindsey)
October 29, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip D. Tegeler on behalf of Open Communities Alliance, SouthCoast Fair Housing (Tegeler, Philip)
October 28, 2020 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #4 MOTION for Attorney(s) Sandra S. Park, Sarah E. Watson, Thomas S. Silverstein, Brian C. Corman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $800 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6173339) by Open Communities Alliance, SouthCoast Fair Housing. (Park, Sandra)
October 27, 2020 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #4 MOTION for Attorney(s) Sandra S. Park, Sarah E. Watson, Thomas S. Silverstein, Brian C. Corman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $800 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6173339) by Open Communities Alliance, SouthCoast Fair Housing. (Corman, Brian)
October 27, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Watson on behalf of Open Communities Alliance, SouthCoast Fair Housing (Watson, Sarah)
October 26, 2020 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #10 MOTION for Attorney(s) Joseph M. Sellers to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6174112) by Open Communities Alliance, SouthCoast Fair Housing. (Sellers, Joseph)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Joseph M. Sellers. Certificate of Good Standing due by 12/22/2020. Signed by Clerk on 10/23/2020. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
October 23, 2020 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Ben Carson, Department of Housing and Urban Development* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Elana Spungen Bildner* *ACLU Foundation of Connecticut* *765 Asylum Avenue, 1st Floor* *Hartford, CT 06105*. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
October 22, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Sandra Park on behalf of Open Communities Alliance, SouthCoast Fair Housing (Park, Sandra)
October 22, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Samuel Silverstein on behalf of Open Communities Alliance, SouthCoast Fair Housing (Silverstein, Thomas)
October 22, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Attorney(s) Joseph M. Sellers to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6174112) by Open Communities Alliance, SouthCoast Fair Housing. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph Sellers)(Bildner, Elana)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Sandra S. Park, Sarah E. Watson, Thomas S. Silverstein, Brian C. Corman. Certificate of Good Standing due by 12/21/2020. Signed by Clerk on 10/22/2020. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
October 22, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #7 Protective Order, #4 MOTION for Attorney(s) Sandra S. Park, Sarah E. Watson, Thomas S. Silverstein, Brian C. Corman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $800 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6173339) filed by Open Communities Alliance, SouthCoast Fair Housing, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Open Communities Alliance, SouthCoast Fair Housing, #1 Complaint filed by Open Communities Alliance, SouthCoast Fair Housing, #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #6 Electronic Filing Order, #3 Notice of Appearance filed by Open Communities Alliance, SouthCoast Fair Housing Signed by Clerk on 10/22/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 10/22/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 10/2/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/21/2020 Discovery due by 4/23/2021 Dispositive Motions due by 5/28/2021 Signed by Clerk on 10/22/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
October 22, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Attorney(s) Sandra S. Park, Sarah E. Watson, Thomas S. Silverstein, Brian C. Corman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $800 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6173339) by Open Communities Alliance, SouthCoast Fair Housing. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sandra Park, #2 Declaration of Sarah Watson, #3 Declaration of Thomas Silverstein, #4 Declaration of Brian Corman)(Bildner, Elana)
October 22, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Dan Barrett on behalf of Open Communities Alliance, SouthCoast Fair Housing (Barrett, Dan)
October 22, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Elana Spungen Bildner on behalf of Open Communities Alliance, SouthCoast Fair Housing (Bildner, Elana)
October 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-6172994.), filed by Open Communities Alliance, SouthCoast Fair Housing.(Bildner, Elana)
October 22, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Bildner, Elana)
October 22, 2020 Judge Janet Bond Arterton added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Open Communities Alliance et al v. Carson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Open Communities Alliance
Represented By: Elana Spungen Bildner
Represented By: Thomas Samuel Silverstein
Represented By: Sandra Park
Represented By: Dan Barrett
Represented By: Lindsey Kaley
Represented By: Sarah Watson
Represented By: Philip D. Tegeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SouthCoast Fair Housing
Represented By: Elana Spungen Bildner
Represented By: Thomas Samuel Silverstein
Represented By: Sandra Park
Represented By: Dan Barrett
Represented By: Lindsey Kaley
Represented By: Sarah Watson
Represented By: Philip D. Tegeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Carson
Represented By: Brian C. Rosen-Shaud
Represented By: Julie G. Turbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Housing and Urban Development
Represented By: Brian C. Rosen-Shaud
Represented By: Julie G. Turbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?