Hunte v. Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Plaintiff: Anika Hunte
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01626
Filed: October 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Referring Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2020 Answer deadline updated for Abbott Laboratories, Inc. to 1/27/2021. (Oliver, T.)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 the Defendant's consent motion for an extension of time. The Defendant's responsive pleading is now due by January 27, 2021. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 12/21/2020. (Rosenberg, J.)
December 18, 2020 Filing 25 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until January 27, 2021 to File a Responsive Pleading by Abbott Laboratories, Inc.. (Reid, Kelcie)
December 16, 2020 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #13 MOTION for Attorney(s) Dan H. Hoang to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6224494) by Abbott Laboratories, Inc.. (Robinson, John)
December 16, 2020 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #15 MOTION for Attorney(s) Scott P. Glauberman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6224516) by Abbott Laboratories, Inc.. (Robinson, John)
December 16, 2020 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #11 MOTION for Attorney(s) Bryce A. Cooper to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6224427) by Abbott Laboratories, Inc.. (Robinson, John)
December 16, 2020 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #14 MOTION for Attorney(s) Stephen V. D'Amore to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6224509) by Abbott Laboratories, Inc.. (Robinson, John)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 12/1/2020.(Jaiman, R.)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER denying as moot #16 consent motion to transfer. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 12/1/2020. (Rosenberg, J.)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Stefan R. Underhill for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 11/30/2020.(Gutierrez, Y.)
November 20, 2020 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #12 MOTION for Attorney(s) Chante B. Westmoreland to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6224488) by Abbott Laboratories, Inc.. (Reid, Kelcie)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificates of Good Standing due by 1/17/2021. Signed by Clerk on 11/18/2020. (Freberg, B)
November 16, 2020 Filing 16 Consent MOTION to Transfer to Another District by Abbott Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Robinson, John)
November 16, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Attorney(s) Scott P. Glauberman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6224516) by Abbott Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Scott P. Glauberman)(Robinson, John)
November 16, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Attorney(s) Stephen V. D'Amore to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6224509) by Abbott Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Stephen V. D'Amore)(Robinson, John)
November 16, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Attorney(s) Dan H. Hoang to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6224494) by Abbott Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Dan H. Hoang)(Robinson, John)
November 16, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Attorney(s) Chante B. Westmoreland to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6224488) by Abbott Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Chante B. Westmoreland)(Robinson, John)
November 16, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Attorney(s) Bryce A. Cooper to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6224427) by Abbott Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Bryce A. Cooper)(Robinson, John)
November 16, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelcie Burns Reid on behalf of Abbott Laboratories, Inc. (Reid, Kelcie)
November 16, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Robinson on behalf of Abbott Laboratories, Inc. (Robinson, John)
November 9, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Abbott Laboratories, Inc. waiver sent on 10/28/2020, answer due 12/27/2020 filed by Anika Hunte. (Rojas, Jose)
October 30, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen M. Reck on behalf of Anika Hunte (Reck, Stephen)
October 29, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott D. Camassar on behalf of Anika Hunte (Camassar, Scott)
October 28, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Protective Order, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint filed by Anika Hunte Signed by Clerk on 10/28/2020.(Freberg, B)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 10/28/2020.(Freberg, B)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 10/28/2020.(Freberg, B)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/27/2020; Discovery due by 4/29/2021; Dispositive Motions due by 6/3/2021. Signed by Clerk on 10/28/2020.(Freberg, B)
October 28, 2020 Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer added. (Oliver, T.)
October 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Abbott Laboratories, Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-6187478.), filed by Anika Hunte.(Rojas, Jose)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunte v. Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Kelcie Burns Reid
Represented By: John J. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anika Hunte
Represented By: Jose M. Rojas
Represented By: Scott D. Camassar
Represented By: Stephen M. Reck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?