Franklin Mutual Series Funds et al v. Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Franklin Mutual Series Funds, Templeton Funds, Templeton Growth Fund, Inc., Franklin Investors Securities Trust, Franklin Templeton Investments Australia Limited, Franklin Templeton Investment Funds, Franklin Templeton Investments Corp., Franklin Templeton Variable Insurance Products Trust, Fiduciary Trust International of the South, Franklin Templeton Investments (Asia) Limited, Templeton Growth Fund II Limited, Franklin Templeton Investment Trust Management Co., LTD, Templeton Global Investment Trust, Templeton Global Fund LTD., Templeton Global (Euro) Fund, Franklin Mutual U.S. Shares Fund, Franklin Balanced Fund and Templeton Global Growth Fund LTD.
Defendant: Sigurdur Olafsson, Michael McClellan, Kare Schultz, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Erez Vigodman and Eyal Desheh
Case Number: 3:2020cv01630
Filed: October 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2020 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Eyal Desheh, Michael Mcclellan, Sigurdur Olafsson, Kare Schultz, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Erez Vigodman* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *William H. Clendenen, Jr.* *Clendenen & Shea* *400 Orange St.* *New Haven, CT 06511*. (Oliver, T.)
November 6, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Clendenen, William)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 11/5/2020.(Jaiman, R.)
November 5, 2020 ENTERED IN ERROR - Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Plaintiffs. (Clendenen, William) Modified on 11/6/2020 (Oliver, T.).
November 4, 2020 Cases associated. Create association to 3:17-cv-00558-SRU. (Oliver, T.)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER directing the Clerk to consolidate this case into Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board v. Teva Pharm. Indus., Ltd., et al., No. 3:17-cv-558 (SRU). Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 11/04/2020. (Rosenberg, J.)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Stefan R. Underhill for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 11/4/2020.(Gutierrez, Y.)
October 30, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Related Case by Fiduciary Trust International of the South, Franklin Investors Securities Trust, Franklin Mutual Series Funds, Franklin Templeton Investment Funds, Franklin Templeton Investment Trust Management Co., LTD, Franklin Templeton Investments (Asia) Limited, Franklin Templeton Investments Australia Limited, Franklin Templeton Investments Corp., Franklin Templeton Variable Insurance Products Trust, Templeton Funds, Templeton Global Growth Fund LTD., Templeton Global Investment Trust, Templeton Growth Fund II Limited, Templeton Growth Fund, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Clendenen, William)
October 29, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Protective Order, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint, filed by Fiduciary Trust International of the South, Franklin Mutual Series Funds, Templeton Global Investment Trust, Franklin Templeton Variable Insurance Products Trust, Franklin Templeton Investments Australia Limited, Franklin Templeton Investment Trust Management Co., LTD, Templeton Growth Fund II Limited, Franklin Investors Securities Trust, Franklin Templeton Investments Corp., Franklin Templeton Investments (Asia) Limited, Templeton Growth Fund, Inc., Templeton Global Growth Fund LTD., Franklin Templeton Investment Funds, Templeton Funds Signed by Clerk on 10/29/2020.(Freberg, B)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 10/28/2020.(Freberg, B)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 10/28/2020.(Freberg, B)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/28/2020; Discovery due by 4/30/2021; Dispositive Motions due by 6/4/2021. Signed by Clerk on 10/28/2020.(Freberg, B)
October 28, 2020 Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer added. (Oliver, T.)
October 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Michael McClellan, Sigurdur Olafsson, Kare Schultz, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Erez Vigodman ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-6188011.), filed by Templeton Growth Fund II Limited, Fiduciary Trust International of the South, Franklin Templeton Variable Insurance Products Trust, Franklin Mutual Series Funds, Templeton Growth Fund, Inc., Franklin Investors Securities Trust, Franklin Templeton Investments Australia Limited, Franklin Templeton Investments (Asia) Limited, Franklin Templeton Investment Trust Management Co., LTD, Franklin Templeton Investment Funds, Templeton Global Fund LTD., Templeton Funds, Franklin Templeton Investments Corp., Templeton Global Investment Trust. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B)(Clendenen, William) Modified on 10/29/2020 to add filer(Walker, J.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Franklin Mutual Series Funds et al v. Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Franklin Mutual Series Funds
Represented By: William H. Clendenen, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Templeton Funds
Represented By: William H. Clendenen, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Templeton Growth Fund, Inc.
Represented By: William H. Clendenen, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Franklin Investors Securities Trust
Represented By: William H. Clendenen, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Franklin Templeton Investments Australia Limited
Represented By: William H. Clendenen, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Franklin Templeton Investment Funds
Represented By: William H. Clendenen, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Franklin Templeton Investments Corp.
Represented By: William H. Clendenen, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Franklin Templeton Variable Insurance Products Trust
Represented By: William H. Clendenen, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fiduciary Trust International of the South
Represented By: William H. Clendenen, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Franklin Templeton Investments (Asia) Limited
Represented By: William H. Clendenen, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Templeton Growth Fund II Limited
Represented By: William H. Clendenen, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Franklin Templeton Investment Trust Management Co., LTD
Represented By: William H. Clendenen, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Templeton Global Investment Trust
Represented By: William H. Clendenen, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Templeton Global Fund LTD.
Represented By: William H. Clendenen, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Templeton Global (Euro) Fund
Represented By: William H. Clendenen, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Franklin Mutual U.S. Shares Fund
Represented By: William H. Clendenen, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Franklin Balanced Fund
Represented By: William H. Clendenen, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Templeton Global Growth Fund LTD.
Represented By: William H. Clendenen, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sigurdur Olafsson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael McClellan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kare Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erez Vigodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eyal Desheh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?