Otuwa v. Testani et al
Plaintiff: Christina Otuwa
Defendant: City of Bridgeport, Bridgeport Board of Education and Michael Testani
Case Number: 3:2020cv01646
Filed: October 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet C Hall
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER re: Case Management PlanDiscovery due by 9/30/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 10/15/2021. Status Report due by 3/22/2021. Trial Brief due by 10/15/2021. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 12/22/2020. (Reis, Julia)
December 1, 2020 Filing 11 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Interlandi, Anthony)
November 20, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Special Defenses with JURY DEMAND by City of Bridgeport, Bridgeport Board of Education, Michael Testani.(Driscoll, Ryan)
November 2, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard J. Buturla on behalf of City of Bridgeport, Bridgeport Board of Education, Michael Testani (Buturla, Richard)
November 2, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Michael Testani, City of Bridgeport, Bridgeport Board of Education, #2 Notice (Other) filed by Michael Testani, City of Bridgeport, Bridgeport Board of Education, #3 Notice of Appearance filed by Michael Testani, City of Bridgeport, Bridgeport Board of Education, #4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #5 Electronic Filing Order, #6 Standing Protective Order, #7 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Clerk on 11/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removals)(Reis, Julia)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/30/2020. (Reis, Julia)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/30/2020. (Reis, Julia)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/30/2020. (Reis, Julia)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/29/2020. Discovery due by 5/1/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 6/5/2021. Signed by Clerk on 10/30/2020. (Reis, Julia)
October 30, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan P Driscoll on behalf of Bridgeport Board of Education, City of Bridgeport, Michael Testani (Driscoll, Ryan)
October 30, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by Bridgeport Board of Education, City of Bridgeport, Michael Testani re #1 Notice of Removal, NOTICE OF PENDING MOTIONS (Attachments: #1 STATEMENT IN RESPONSE TO STANDING ORDER, #2 CERTIFICATION)(Driscoll, Ryan)
October 30, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by City of Bridgeport, Bridgeport Board of Education, Michael Testani from Bridgeport Superior Court, case number FBT NO CV 20 6099655 S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-6193390, filed by City of Bridgeport, Bridgeport Board of Education, Michael Testani.(Driscoll, Ryan)
October 30, 2020 Judge Janet C. Hall added. (Oliver, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Otuwa v. Testani et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Bridgeport
Represented By: Ryan P Driscoll
Represented By: Richard J. Buturla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bridgeport Board of Education
Represented By: Ryan P Driscoll
Represented By: Richard J. Buturla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Testani
Represented By: Ryan P Driscoll
Represented By: Richard J. Buturla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Otuwa
Represented By: Anthony J Interlandi, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?