White v. American National Red Cross et al
Plaintiff: Amethyst White
Defendant: American National Red Cross, American Red Cross of Connecticut and American Red Cross
Case Number: 3:2020cv01691
Filed: November 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet Bond Arterton
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/25/2022 at 4:00 PM. Status report due by 4/18/2022. Amended Pleadings due by 6/1/2021 Discovery due by 5/1/2022 Following a pre-filing conference, Dispositive Motions due by 6/1/2022 Trial Ready Date 12/1/2022.(Tooker, Aimee)
December 21, 2020 Filing 17 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Buckley, John)
November 20, 2020 Filing 16 CLAIM for Jury Trial by Amethyst White. (Buckley, John)
November 20, 2020 Filing 15 RESPONSE re #14 Answer to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses filed by Amethyst White. (Buckley, John)
November 18, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by American National Red Cross, American Red Cross, American Red Cross of Connecticut.(Ruszkowski, Vimala)
November 16, 2020 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Red Cross. (Ruszkowski, Vimala)
November 16, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE by American Red Cross of Removal Statement (Ruszkowski, Vimala)
November 16, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE by American Red Cross of Pending Motions (Ruszkowski, Vimala)
November 16, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by John M. Parese on behalf of Amethyst White (Parese, John)
November 16, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by John F. Buckley, Jr on behalf of Amethyst White (Buckley, John)
November 12, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Vimala B Ruszkowski on behalf of American National Red Cross CORRECTED (Ruszkowski, Vimala)
November 12, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Notice of Appearance filed by American National Red Cross, #5 Electronic Filing Order, #6 Protective Order, #4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by American National Red Cross, #1 Notice of Removal filed by American National Red Cross Signed by Clerk on 11/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases)(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
November 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 11/11/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
November 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 11/11/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
November 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 1/10/2021 Discovery due by 5/13/2021 Dispositive Motions due by 6/17/2021 Signed by Clerk on 11/11/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
November 11, 2020 Judge Janet Bond Arterton added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
November 11, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric J. Stockman on behalf of American National Red Cross (Stockman, Eric)
November 11, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Vimala B Ruszkowski on behalf of American National Red Cross (Ruszkowski, Vimala)
November 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American National Red Cross from Middletown Superior Court, case number MMX-CV20-6029561S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-6215162, filed by American National Red Cross.(Ruszkowski, Vimala)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. American National Red Cross et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American National Red Cross
Represented By: Vimala B Ruszkowski
Represented By: Eric J. Stockman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Red Cross of Connecticut
Represented By: Vimala B Ruszkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Red Cross
Represented By: Vimala B Ruszkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amethyst White
Represented By: John M. Parese
Represented By: Nancy S. Hunter
Represented By: John F. Buckley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?