Martinez v. USA
Plaintiff: Wilmer Martinez
Defendant: United States Of America and USA
Case Number: 3:2020cv01692
Filed: November 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmer Martinez. USA served on 11/17/2020, answer due 12/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Marshal Return)(Williams, John)
November 12, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *USA* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *John R. Williams* *51 Elm St., Ste. 409* *New Haven, CT 06510*. (Peterson, M)
November 12, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Electronic Filing Order, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Wilmer Martinez, #1 Complaint filed by Wilmer Martinez, #5 Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 11/12/2020. (Peterson, M)
November 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 11/11/2020. (Peterson, M)
November 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 11/11/2020. (Peterson, M)
November 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 1/10/2021. Discovery due by 5/13/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 6/17/2021. Signed by Clerk on 11/11/2020. (Peterson, M)
November 11, 2020 Judge Michael P. Shea added. (Oliver, T.)
November 11, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to USA. (Williams, John) Modified on 11/12/2020 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).
November 11, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Williams on behalf of Wilmer Martinez (Williams, John)
November 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against USA ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-6215559.), filed by Wilmer Martinez.(Williams, John) Modified on 11/12/2020 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilmer Martinez
Represented By: John R. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?