Allstate Insurance Company v. American Freight Outlet Stores, LLC
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Defendant: American Freight Outlet Stores, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv01695
Filed: November 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Alfred V Covello
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2021 Filing 15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until February 10, 2021 to join additional parties or amend its pleading by American Freight Outlet Stores, LLC. (Roberts, Greil)
December 23, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Louis Anthony Spadaccini on behalf of Allstate Insurance Company (Spadaccini, Louis)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Attorney Louis A. Spadaccini shall file a notice of appearance pursuant to Local Rule 5(b). Attorney Joseph M. Kuffler shall submit an affidavit in full compliance with Local Rule 83.1(d)(1) by including a complete statement relating to Local Rule 83.1(d)(1)(c)(i) and (ii). Upon the filing of the aforementioned items, the court will consider the motion for attorney Joseph M. Kuffler to be admitted pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 12/17/2020. (Sondergeld, C.)
December 3, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Attorney(s) Joseph M. Kuffler to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6256710) by Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Spadaccini, Louis)
November 19, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Answer and Affirmative Defenses by American Freight Outlet Stores, LLC.(Roberts, Greil)
November 16, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allstate Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Allstate Insurance Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent The Allstate Corporation for Allstate Insurance Company. (Spadaccini, Louis)
November 13, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Sheldon Poole on behalf of American Freight Outlet Stores, LLC (Poole, Sheldon)
November 13, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Notice (Other) filed by American Freight Outlet Stores, LLC, #6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Notice (Other) filed by American Freight Outlet Stores, LLC, #7 Electronic Filing Order, #5 Corporate Disclosure Statement, filed by American Freight Outlet Stores, LLC, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by American Freight Outlet Stores, LLC, and #4 Notice of Appearance filed by American Freight Outlet Stores, LLC. Signed by Clerk on 11/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases)(Bozek, M.)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 11/12/2020.(Bozek, M.)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 1/11/2021. Discovery due by 5/14/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 6/18/2021. Signed by Clerk on 11/12/2020.(Bozek, M.)
November 12, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Freight Outlet Stores, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Franchise Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Franchise Group New Holdco, LLC, Other Affiliate Franchise Group Newco S, LLC, Other Affiliate Franchise Group Intermediate S, LLC, Other Affiliate Franchise Group Newco Intermediate AF, LLC, Other Affiliate Franchise Group Intermediate Holdco, LLC for American Freight Outlet Stores, LLC. (Roberts, Greil)
November 12, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Greil Roberts on behalf of American Freight Outlet Stores, LLC (Roberts, Greil)
November 12, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by American Freight Outlet Stores, LLC Certificate of Compliance with Standing Order on Removed Cases (Roberts, Greil)
November 12, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by American Freight Outlet Stores, LLC Notice of Pending Motions (Roberts, Greil)
November 12, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American Freight Outlet Stores, LLC from Judicial District of Hartford, case number HHD-CV20-6134179-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-6216881, filed by American Freight Outlet Stores, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Roberts, Greil)
November 12, 2020 Judge Alfred V. Covello added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Insurance Company v. American Freight Outlet Stores, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Louis Anthony Spadaccini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Freight Outlet Stores, LLC
Represented By: Greil Roberts
Represented By: Sheldon Poole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?