USA v. $36,425.58
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: 2011 Lexus IS350 being VIN JTHCE5C26B5000839, $40,058.00 in United States Currency and $36,425.58
Claimant: Anatoly Braylovsky
Case Number: 3:2020cv01747
Filed: November 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by James I. Glasser on behalf of Anatoly Braylovsky (Glasser, James)
December 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Stay until the parallel criminal proceeding involving the Claimant is resolved. Counsel for the United States shall file a motion to lift stay within 14 days of the conclusion of the parallel criminal proceeding. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 12/12/20. (Dooley, Kari)
December 11, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Stay by USA.Responses due by 1/1/2021 (Nelson, David)
November 23, 2020 Filing 5 WARRANT of Arrest in Rem Issued (Reis, Julia)
November 23, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by USA, #3 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 11/23/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 11/20/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 11/20/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
November 20, 2020 Judge Kari A. Dooley added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
November 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT of Forfeiture against All Defendants, filed by USA.(Nelson, David) Modified on 11/20/2020 to update party (Anastasio, F.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. $36,425.58
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Anatoly Braylovsky
Represented By: James I. Glasser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2011 Lexus IS350 being VIN JTHCE5C26B5000839
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $40,058.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $36,425.58
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: David Christopher Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?