Great Northern Insurance Company v. Whirlpool Corporation et al
Plaintiff: GREAT NORTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY a/s/o Christopher Kraus and Darcy Stacom and Great Northern Insurance Company
Defendant: Whirlpool Corporation and General Electric Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv01842
Filed: December 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Attorney(s) Kyle W. LeClere to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6363155) by Whirlpool Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Rogers, Holly)
January 25, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to #13 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim by Whirlpool Corporation.(Rogers, Holly)
January 19, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia Ann Boyce Iassogna on behalf of Great Northern Insurance Company (Iassogna, Patricia Ann)
January 15, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Answer to Crossclaim and, CROSSCLAIM against Whirlpool Corporation by General Electric Company.(Kane, John)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Michael P. Shea for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 1/13/2021. (Reis, Julia)
January 12, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by John Higgins Kane on behalf of General Electric Company (Kane, John)
December 18, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and, CROSSCLAIM against General Electric Company by Whirlpool Corporation.(Rogers, Holly)
December 18, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Whirlpool Corporation identifying Corporate Parent PRIMECAP Management Company, Corporate Parent Vanguard Group, Inc. for Whirlpool Corporation. (Rogers, Holly)
December 14, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Whirlpool Corporation, #2 Notice (Other) filed by Whirlpool Corporation, #3 Notice (Other) filed by Whirlpool Corporation, #4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #5 Electronic Filing Order, #6 Standing Protective Order, #7 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Clerk on 12/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removals)(Reis, Julia)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 12/11/2020. (Reis, Julia)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 12/11/2020. (Reis, Julia)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 12/11/2020. (Reis, Julia)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 2/9/2021. Discovery due by 6/12/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 7/17/2021. Signed by Clerk on 12/11/2020. (Reis, Julia)
December 11, 2020 Judge Janet C. Hall added. (Oliver, T.)
December 11, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by Whirlpool Corporation NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH STANDING ORDER (Rogers, Holly)
December 11, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by Whirlpool Corporation NOTICE OF NO PENDING MOTIONS FILING (Rogers, Holly)
December 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Whirlpool Corporation from Bridgeport, CT, case number FBT-CV20-6102052-S. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACTDC-6273476, filed by Whirlpool Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons, #2 Exhibit B - Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Return of Service, #4 Exhibit D - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal)(Rogers, Holly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Great Northern Insurance Company v. Whirlpool Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whirlpool Corporation
Represented By: Holly G. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: John Higgins Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GREAT NORTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY a/s/o Christopher Kraus and Darcy Stacom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great Northern Insurance Company
Represented By: William J. Shea
Represented By: Patricia Ann Boyce Iassogna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?