Hanna et al v. Crane Co. et al
Plaintiff: Raymond Hanna, Jr. and Nancy Hanna
Defendant: Foster Wheeler LLC and Crane Co.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01857
Filed: December 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2021 Filing 20 ANSWER to #19 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim by defendant Foster Wheeler, LLC by Crane Co..(Lyons, Thomas)
February 10, 2021 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Special Defenses with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against Crane Co. by Foster Wheeler LLC.(Oswald, James)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 MOTION for Extension of Time Nunc Pro Tunc . Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 2/8/2021. (Freberg, B)
February 5, 2021 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Foster Wheeler LLC. (Oswald, James)
February 5, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time Nunc Pro Tunc by Foster Wheeler LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Oswald, James)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER RE DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER, LLC'S FAILURE TO ANSWER OR TIMELY RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND CROSSCLAIM. According to the record before the Court, plaintiffs have filed and served a complaint, but defendant Foster Wheeler, LLC has failed to file an answer or other response within the time limits permitted under the rules. In addition, defendant Crane Co. has filed a crossclaim on defendant Foster Wheeler. Doc. #10. Accordingly, given defendant Foster Wheeler's failure to file an answer to the complaint and the crossclaim, the Court directs plaintiffs and defendant Crane Co. to each move for entry of a default pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(a) on or before 21 days from now. See City of New York v. Mickalas Pawn Shop, LLC, 645 F.3d 113, 128 (2d Cir. 2011). Failure to do so will result in the Court dismissing the claims against Foster Wheeler for failure to prosecute. See D. Conn. L. Civ. R. 41(a). In the event that defendant Foster Wheeler chooses in the interim to file an answer or other response to the complaint and the crossclaim, Foster Wheeler shall file a motion for extension of time nunc pro tunc stating why there is good cause for its failure to comply with the Court's scheduling requirements. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 2/3/2021. (DeBot, B.)
January 6, 2021 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Dispositive Motions due by 5/15/2022; Joint Trial Memorandum due by 5/15/2022; Telephonic Status Conference set for 7/30/2021 03:00 PM before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer (Freberg, B)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 GENERAL SCHEDULING ORDER. The parties' Rule 26(f) Planning Report (Doc. #13 ) is hereby APPROVED as modified by this order. All fact discovery shall be completed by October 29, 2021, depositions of trial experts shall be completed by April 15, 2022, although per the parties stipulation depositions of experts may be taken until 2 weeks before trial, and all other interim discovery dates set forth in the parties' Rule 26(f) Report are hereby adopted. Any dispositive summary judgment motions shall be filed by May 15, 2022, and any response to dispositive summary judgment motions shall be filed by June 14, 2022. The parties' joint trial memorandum is due by May 15, 2022, or within 30 days of the Court's ruling on dispositive summary judgment motions, whichever date is later. The Court will thereafter set a trial date, and the parties should be prepared to proceed to jury selection within 30 days of the filing of the joint trial memorandum. Please refer to Judge Meyer's webpage on the District of Connecticut website for Judge Meyer's "Instructions for Discovery Disputes" and "Instructions for Joint Trial Memorandum" and "Pretrial Preferences" and "Trial Preferences." The parties are encouraged to commence discovery forthwith and to arrange their schedules in contemplation of the briefing deadlines for any dispositive motions, because the Court is unlikely to grant a future request for an extension of the scheduling order absent extraordinary and unforeseeable circumstances. A telephonic status conference will be held on July 30, 2021 at 3:00 PM. Parties are instructed to call 877-402-9753; Access Code 8576007#. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 1/6/2021. (DeBot, B.)
January 5, 2021 Filing 13 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Lyons, Thomas)
January 5, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly A. Kincaid on behalf of Foster Wheeler LLC (Kincaid, Kelly)
January 5, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by James R. Oswald on behalf of Foster Wheeler LLC (Oswald, James)
December 17, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Crane Co..(Lyons, Thomas)
December 16, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by Crane Co., #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Crane Co., #6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #8 Protective Order, #4 Notice (Other) filed by Crane Co., #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Crane Co., #7 Electronic Filing Order, #5 Notice (Other) filed by Crane Co. Signed by Clerk on 12/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removals)(Freberg, B)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 12/15/2020.(Freberg, B)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 12/15/2020.(Freberg, B)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 2/13/2021; Discovery due by 6/16/2021; Dispositive Motions due by 7/21/2021. Signed by Clerk on 12/15/2020.(Freberg, B)
December 15, 2020 Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
December 15, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by Crane Co. re #1 Notice of Removal,, Statement of Compliance with Standing Orders in Removed Cases (Lyons, Thomas)
December 15, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by Crane Co. re #1 Notice of Removal,, Notice of Pending Motions (Lyons, Thomas)
December 15, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crane Co.. (Lyons, Thomas)
December 15, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas N. Lyons on behalf of Crane Co. (Lyons, Thomas)
December 15, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Crane Co. from Bridgeport Superior Court, case number FBT-CV20-6101799-S. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACTDC-6277118, filed by Crane Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3 (1 of 6), #4 Exhibit 3 (2 of 6), #5 Exhibit 3 (3 of 6), #6 Exhibit 3 (4 of 6), #7 Exhibit 3 (5 of 6), #8 Exhibit 3 (6 of 6), #9 Exhibit 4 (1 of 5), #10 Exhibit 4 (2 of 5), #11 Exhibit 4 (3 of 5), #12 Exhibit 4 (4 of 5), #13 Exhibit 4 (5 of 5), #14 Exhibit 5)(Lyons, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hanna et al v. Crane Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler LLC
Represented By: James R. Oswald
Represented By: Kelly A. Kincaid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Thomas N. Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Hanna, Jr.
Represented By: Brian P. Kenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Hanna
Represented By: Brian P. Kenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?