American Commerce Insurance Co v. Janazzo Energy LLC
Plaintiff: American Commerce Insurance Co
Defendant: Janazzo Energy LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00036
Filed: January 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2021 Filing 12 Memorandum in Opposition re #9 First MOTION to Dismiss filed by American Commerce Insurance Co. (Blackburn, Stuart)
March 3, 2021 Reset Deadlines as to #9 First Motion to Dismiss - Responses due by 3/12/2021 (Barry, Donna)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time until 03/12/2021 to respond to Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 03/03/2021.(Powell, G.)
March 2, 2021 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until March 12, 2021 Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by American Commerce Insurance Co. (Blackburn, Stuart)
February 9, 2021 Filing 9 First MOTION to Dismiss by Janazzo Energy LLC.Responses due by 3/2/2021 (Mullaney, Thomas)
February 9, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas P. Mullaney, III on behalf of Janazzo Energy LLC (Mullaney, Thomas)
January 26, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Commerce Insurance Co. Janazzo Energy LLC served on 1/16/2021, answer due 2/6/2021. (Blackburn, Stuart)
January 12, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Janazzo Energy LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Stuart G. Blackburn* *Two Concorde Way,Bldg 3C, PO Box 608* *Windsor Locks, CT 06096* (Fazekas, J.)
January 12, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Standing Protective Order, #1 Complaint filed by American Commerce Insurance Co, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 01/11/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 01/11/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 01/11/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 3/12/2021. Discovery due by 7/13/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 8/17/2021. Signed by Clerk on 01/11/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
January 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Janazzo Energy LLC ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-6320874.), filed by American Commerce Insurance Co. (Blackburn, Stuart) Modified on 1/11/2021 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).
January 11, 2021 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Janazzo Energy LLC. (Blackburn, Stuart)
January 11, 2021 Judge Stefan R. Underhill added. (Oliver, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Commerce Insurance Co v. Janazzo Energy LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Commerce Insurance Co
Represented By: Stuart G. Blackburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janazzo Energy LLC
Represented By: Thomas P. Mullaney, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?