Jones v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Plaintiff: Trenee Jones
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation doing business as Amtrak
Case Number: 3:2021cv00051
Filed: January 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1349
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2021 Filing 14 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case by National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (Charkow, Andrew)
March 3, 2021 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Perez, J.)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Based on the #12 report a settlement, the Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to administratively close this case. The parties have until April 2, 2021 to file a stipulation of dismissal or motion to reopen the case. See D. Conn. L. Civ. R. 41(b) (stating, "When counsel of record report to the Court that a civil action pending on its docket has been settled between the parties, the Clerk shall enter an order closing the case, subject to the parties' right to move to reopen within thirty (30) days, unless a longer period is specified by the Court. Dismissal under this rule shall be without costs"). Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 3/2/2021. (Tisdale, I.)
March 1, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Settlement by National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Charkow, Andrew)
January 21, 2021 Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/1/2021 (Perez, J.)
January 21, 2021 Docket Entry Correction: Defense counsel's office called to state #10 Answer to Complaint with jury demand was entered in error. (Barry, Donna)
January 20, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by National Railroad Passenger Corporation.(Charkow, Andrew)
January 20, 2021 Filing 10 ENTERED IN ERROR - ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by National Railroad Passenger Corporation.(Charkow, Andrew) Modified on 1/21/2021 - entered in error/twice by Attorney. (Barry, Donna).
January 14, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Notice of Removal, filed by National Railroad Passenger Corporation, #3 Response filed by National Railroad Passenger Corporation, #2 Notice (Other) filed by National Railroad Passenger Corporation, #6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #7 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement,, filed by National Railroad Passenger Corporation, #8 Protective Order, #5 Notice of Appearance filed by National Railroad Passenger Corporation Signed by Clerk on 1/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Standing order on removed cases)(Imbriani, Susan)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 1/14/2021.(Imbriani, Susan)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 1/14/2021.(Imbriani, Susan)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 3/15/2021; Discovery due by 7/16/2021; Dispositive Motions due by 8/20/2021 Signed by Clerk on 1/14/2021.(Imbriani, Susan)
January 14, 2021 Judge Victor A. Bolden added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
January 14, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Brian Charkow on behalf of National Railroad Passenger Corporation d/b/a Amtrak (Charkow, Andrew)
January 14, 2021 Filing 4 First Corporate Disclosure Statement by National Railroad Passenger Corporation d/b/a Amtrak identifying Corporate Parent American Financial Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Canadian Pacific Railway, Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway, Corporate Parent Passenger Railroad Insurance Limited, Corporate Parent Washington Terminal Company, Corporate Parent Burlington Northern and Santa Fe LLC, Corporate Parent American Premier Underwriters, Inc. for National Railroad Passenger Corporation d/b/a Amtrak. (Charkow, Andrew)
January 14, 2021 Filing 3 RESPONSE filed by National Railroad Passenger Corporation d/b/a Amtrak. (Charkow, Andrew)
January 14, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE by National Railroad Passenger Corporation d/b/a Amtrak (Charkow, Andrew)
January 14, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by National Railroad Passenger Corporation d/b/a Amtrak from judicial District of Hartford, case number HHDCV216136679S. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACTDC-6327914, filed by National Railroad Passenger Corporation d/b/a Amtrak. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Charkow, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation doing business as Amtrak
Represented By: Andrew Brian Charkow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trenee Jones
Represented By: Carla R. Minniefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?