King v. Christine Lee, DMD, LLC
Plaintiff: Shanice King
Defendant: Christine Lee, DMD, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00065
Filed: January 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2612
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2021 Answer deadline updated for Christine Lee, DMD, LLC to 3/22/2021. (Perez, J.)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time until March 22, 2021 To Respond to Complaint. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 02/17/2021. (Millat, C.)
February 17, 2021 Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/2/2021. (Perez, J.)
February 16, 2021 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until March 22, 2021 To Respond to Complaint by Christine Lee, DMD, LLC. (Salazar-Austin, David)
February 16, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by David C. Salazar-Austin on behalf of Christine Lee, DMD, LLC (Salazar-Austin, David)
February 16, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Lynn Vizvary on behalf of Christine Lee, DMD, LLC (Vizvary, Jessica)
February 15, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shanice King. Christine Lee, DMD, LLC served on 1/28/2021, answer due 2/18/2021. (Reilly, Michael)
January 19, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Christine Lee, DMD, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Michael John Reilly* *Cicchiello & Cicchiello, LLP* *364 Franklin Avenue* *Hartford, CT 06114*. (Fazekas, J.)
January 19, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Standing Protective Order, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint filed by Shanice King Signed by Clerk on 01/19/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 01/15/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 01/15/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 3/16/2021. Discovery due by 7/17/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 8/21/2021. Signed by Clerk on 01/15/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
January 15, 2021 Judge Victor A. Bolden added. (Oliver, T.)
January 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Christine Lee, DMD, LLC ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-6331175.), filed by Shanice King.(Reilly, Michael)
January 15, 2021 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Christine Lee, DMD, LLC. (Reilly, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King v. Christine Lee, DMD, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Lee, DMD, LLC
Represented By: Jessica Lynn Vizvary
Represented By: David C. Salazar-Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shanice King
Represented By: Michael John Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?