Kinion v. Fanueff et al
Plaintiff: Paul Kinion
Defendant: Jane Doe, Fanueff, Carson Wright, Richard Furey, Johnny Wright, Mulligan, Tim Bombard, Cyr and John/Jane Doe
Case Number: 3:2021cv00073
Filed: January 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2021 Filing 11 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Paul Kinion. (Attachments: #1 ledger, #2 envelope)(Imbriani, Susan)
February 23, 2021 Filing 10 Notice to petitioner re: Insufficiency #3 Ledger Sheet. You must submit a Ledger Sheet showing the past six months transactions. If insufficiency not corrected Dismissal due by 3/16/2021 Signed by Judge Thomas O. Farrish on 2/23/21.(Payton, R.)
January 25, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Address by Paul Kinion (Payton, R.)
January 20, 2021 Filing 8 Notice to petitioner re: Insufficiency #3 Ledger Sheet. You must submit a Ledger Sheet showing the past six months transactions. If insufficiency not corrected Dismissal due by 2/10/21 Signed by Judge Thomas O. Farrish on 1/20/21.(Payton, R.)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 1/19/2021.(Freberg, B)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Prisoner E-Filing Standing Order. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 1/19/2021.(Freberg, B)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 1/19/2021.(Freberg, B)
January 19, 2021 Filing 4 PRISCS - MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Paul Kinion. (Freberg, B)
January 19, 2021 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Paul Kinion. (Freberg, B)
January 19, 2021 Filing 2 PRISCS - MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Paul Kinion. (Freberg, B)
January 19, 2021 Filing 1 PRISCS - COMPLAINT against Tim Bombard, Cyr, Jane Doe, John/Jane Doe(#2, Correctional Officer / 3Easti2016 - Individual/Official), John/Jane Doe(#3, Correctional Officer, 3Easti2016 - Individual/Official), Fanueff, Richard Furey, Mulligan, Carson Wright, Johnny Wright, filed by Paul Kinion.(Freberg, B)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kinion v. Fanueff et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fanueff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carson Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Furey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnny Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mulligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Bombard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cyr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Kinion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?