Monroe RE, LLC et al v. Fairfield et al
Plaintiff: CT YA Services, LLC doing business as Newport Academy and Monroe RE, LLC
Defendant: Town of Fairfield and Brenda L. Kupchick
Case Number: 3:2021cv00078
Filed: January 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 3601
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2021 Filing 29 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until April 19, 2021for Plaintiffs Reply to Motion to Dismiss Set Motion and Rcmd Ruling Deadlines/Hearings, Set Deadlines/Hearings by CT YA Services, LLC, Monroe RE, LLC. (Ramchandani, Tara)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: Defendants have filed a #27 Motion to Dismiss. On or before April 5, 2021, Plaintiff shall either file a response to the motion or file an amended complaint in which it pleads as many facts as possible, consistent with Rule 11, to address the alleged defects discussed in Defendants' memorandum of law. The Court will not allow further amendments after April 5, 2021. If Plaintiff chooses to amend and if Defendants renew their motion to dismiss, Defendants may incorporate by reference any prior briefing. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 3/16/2021. (Constantine, A.)
March 16, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #27 MOTION to Dismiss .(Responses due by 4/5/2021, ) or ( Amended Complaint due by 4/5/2021) (Johnson, D.)
March 15, 2021 Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss by Town of Fairfield, Brenda L. Kupchick.Responses due by 4/5/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Ex. A)(Varga, Douglas)
February 16, 2021 Answer deadline updated for Town of Fairfield to 3/15/2021; Brenda L. Kupchick to 3/15/2021. (Johnson, D.)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER : Defendants' motion (ECF No. #25 ) for an extension of time until March 15, 2021 in which to respond to the complaint is granted. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 2/16/21. (Constantine, A.)
February 11, 2021 Filing 25 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until March 15, 2021 to file an answer or motion addressed to plaintiffs' #1 Complaint, by Town of Fairfield, Brenda L. Kupchick. (Varga, Douglas)
February 11, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott R. Lucas on behalf of Town of Fairfield, Brenda L. Kupchick (Lucas, Scott)
February 11, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas J. Varga on behalf of Town of Fairfield, Brenda L. Kupchick (Varga, Douglas)
February 5, 2021 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #14 MOTION for Attorney(s) David G. Thomas to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by CT YA Services, LLC, Monroe RE, LLC. (Thomas, David)
February 5, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by David G Thomas on behalf of CT YA Services, LLC, Monroe RE, LLC (Thomas, David)
January 27, 2021 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #12 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael Allen to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by CT YA Services, LLC, Monroe RE, LLC. (Allen, Michael)
January 27, 2021 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #13 MOTION for Attorney(s) Tara Ramchandani to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by CT YA Services, LLC, Monroe RE, LLC. (Ramchandani, Tara)
January 27, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Tara K Ramchandani on behalf of CT YA Services, LLC, Monroe RE, LLC (Ramchandani, Tara)
January 27, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Gerhart Allen on behalf of CT YA Services, LLC, Monroe RE, LLC (Allen, Michael)
January 27, 2021 Per AFFIDAVIT of Service #16 , Answer deadline updated for Town of Fairfield to 2/12/2021; Brenda L. Kupchick to 2/12/2021. (Peterson, M)
January 25, 2021 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service served on Town of Fairfield, Brenda Kupchick on 1/25/2021, filed by CT YA Services, LLC, Monroe RE, LLC. (Allen, Michael)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Certificate of Good Standing due by 3/23/2021. Signed by Clerk on 01/22/2021. (Peterson, M)
January 22, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Attorney(s) David G. Thomas to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by CT YA Services, LLC, Monroe RE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit)(Rich, Brian)
January 22, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Attorney(s) Tara Ramchandani to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by CT YA Services, LLC, Monroe RE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit)(Rich, Brian)
January 22, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael Allen to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by CT YA Services, LLC, Monroe RE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit)(Rich, Brian)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. The motions (ECF Nos. #3 , #4 and #5 ) are DENIED for failure to conform to Local Rule 83.1(d)(1)(b) (The motion shall be accompanied by an affidavit, duly sworn and executed by the proposed visiting attorney: identifying the bar of each court of which said attorney is and has ever been a member, and the corresponding bar identification number(s); or if no such numbers have been assigned, so stating.). The motion can be re-filed in accordance with the Local Rule. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 01/20/2021. (Peterson, M)
January 20, 2021 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Town of Fairfield, Brenda L. Kupchick* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Michael Gerhart Allen* *Relman, Dane & Colfax, PLLC-DC* *1225 19th Street., NW, Suite 600* *Washington, DC 20036*. (Peterson, M)
January 20, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Attorney(s) David G. Thomas to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6336459) by CT YA Services, LLC, Monroe RE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit)(Rich, Brian)
January 20, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Attorney(s) Tara Ramchandani to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6336456) by CT YA Services, LLC, Monroe RE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit)(Rich, Brian)
January 20, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael Allen to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6336438) by CT YA Services, LLC, Monroe RE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit)(Rich, Brian)
January 19, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael Allen to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6336438) filed by Monroe RE, LLC, CT YA Services, LLC, #7 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint, filed by Monroe RE, LLC, CT YA Services, LLC, #4 MOTION for Attorney(s) Tara Ramchandani to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6336456) filed by Monroe RE, LLC, CT YA Services, LLC, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Monroe RE, LLC, CT YA Services, LLC, #8 Protective Order, #6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #5 MOTION for Attorney(s) David G. Thomas to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6336459) filed by Monroe RE, LLC, CT YA Services, LLC Signed by Clerk on 01/19/2021. (Peterson, M)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 01/19/2021. (Peterson, M)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 01/19/2021. (Peterson, M)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 3/20/2021. Discovery due by 7/21/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 8/25/2021. Signed by Clerk on 01/19/2021. (Peterson, M)
January 19, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian D. Rich on behalf of CT YA Services, LLC, Monroe RE, LLC (Rich, Brian)
January 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-6334739.), filed by Monroe RE, LLC, CT YA Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 Berchem Moses Legal Opinion of July 9, 2019, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 Kupchick Letter of February 13, 2020, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 Baldwin Letter of November 5, 2020)(Allen, Michael)
January 19, 2021 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Allen, Michael)
January 19, 2021 Judge Michael P. Shea added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Monroe RE, LLC et al v. Fairfield et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CT YA Services, LLC doing business as Newport Academy
Represented By: Brian D. Rich
Represented By: Michael Gerhart Allen
Represented By: David G Thomas
Represented By: Tara K Ramchandani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monroe RE, LLC
Represented By: Brian D. Rich
Represented By: Michael Gerhart Allen
Represented By: David G Thomas
Represented By: Tara K Ramchandani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Fairfield
Represented By: Scott R. Lucas
Represented By: Douglas J. Varga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda L. Kupchick
Represented By: Scott R. Lucas
Represented By: Douglas J. Varga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?