Shippee v. Matulaitis Nursing Home, Inc.
Plaintiff: Tammy Shippee
Defendant: Matulaitis Nursing Home, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00101
Filed: January 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet Bond Arterton
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1343
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Pre-Filing Conference. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 3/15/21. (Tooker, Aimee)
March 15, 2021 A telephonic pre-filing conference will be held 4/16/21 at 3:00 p.m. Defense counsel shall initiate the conference call to chambers: 203-773-2737. (Tooker, Aimee)
March 11, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Pre-Filing Conference by Matulaitis Nursing Home, Inc.. (Warren, Abby)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time, on consent, to 3/17/21. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 2/10/21. (Tooker, Aimee)
February 10, 2021 Answer deadline updated for Matulaitis Nursing Home, Inc. to 3/17/2021. (Tooker, Aimee)
February 9, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Anne Zaklukiewicz on behalf of Matulaitis Nursing Home, Inc. (Zaklukiewicz, Emily)
February 9, 2021 Filing 10 First MOTION for Extension of Time until March 17, 2018 to Respond to Complaint by Matulaitis Nursing Home, Inc.. (Warren, Abby)
February 9, 2021 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Matulaitis Nursing Home, Inc.. (Warren, Abby)
February 9, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Abby M. Warren on behalf of Matulaitis Nursing Home, Inc. (Warren, Abby)
January 26, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tammy Shippee. Matulaitis Nursing Home, Inc. served on 1/25/2021, answer due 2/15/2021. (Sabatini, James)
January 25, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Matulaitis Nursing Home, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *James V. Sabatini* *Sabatini & Associates* *One Market Square* *Newington, CT 06111*. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
January 25, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Protective Order, #1 Complaint filed by Tammy Shippee Signed by Clerk on 1/25/2021.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
January 22, 2021 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Matulaitis Nursing Home, Inc.. (Sabatini, James)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 1/21/2021.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 1/21/2021.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 3/26/2021 Discovery due by 7/27/2021 Dispositive Motions due by 8/31/2021 Signed by Clerk on 1/21/2021.(Nuzzi, Tiffany) Modified on 1/25/2021 to correct file date (Nuzzi, Tiffany).
January 21, 2021 Judge Janet Bond Arterton added. (Oliver, T.)
January 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Matulaitis Nursing Home, Inc. ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-6340526.), filed by Tammy Shippee. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sabatini, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shippee v. Matulaitis Nursing Home, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Shippee
Represented By: James V. Sabatini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matulaitis Nursing Home, Inc.
Represented By: Emily Anne Zaklukiewicz
Represented By: Abby M. Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?