Little v. Gaiani et al
Plaintiff: Kanesha Little
Defendant: Hamilton Gaiani, Catherine Sacico, Phoenix 43 House, Alessandro Gaiani and Hamilton Hicks
Case Number: 3:2021cv00116
Filed: January 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 3601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kanesha Little. Alessandro Gaiani served on 2/25/2021, answer due 4/21/2021; Hamilton Gaiani served on 2/25/2021, answer due 4/21/2021; Phoenix 43 House served on 2/23/2021, answer due 4/21/2021; Catherine Sacico served on 2/23/2021, answer due 4/21/2021. (Teixeira, Virginia)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 MOTION for Extension of Time until April 21, 2021 to answer or present other defenses or objection to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 3/23/2021. (Freberg, B)
March 23, 2021 Answer deadline updated for Alessandro Gaiani to 4/21/2021; Hamilton Gaiani to 4/21/2021; Phoenix 43 House to 4/21/2021; Catherine Sacico to 4/21/2021. (Freberg, B)
March 22, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time until April 21, 2021 to answer or present other defenses or objection to the Complaint by Alessandro Gaiani, Hamilton Gaiani, Phoenix 43 House, Catherine Sacico. (Orleans, Jonathan)
March 22, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan B. Orleans on behalf of Alessandro Gaiani, Hamilton Gaiani, Phoenix 43 House, Catherine Sacico (Orleans, Jonathan)
February 16, 2021 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Alessandro Gaiani, Hamilton Gaiani, Phoenix 43 House, Catherine Sacico* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Virginia Martins Teixeira* *Connecticut Legal Rights Project, Inc.* *P.O. Box 351 Silver Street* *Middletown, CT 06457*. (Freberg, B)
February 9, 2021 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Teixeira, Virginia)
January 29, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Virginia Martins Teixeira on behalf of Kanesha Little (Teixeira, Virginia)
January 29, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Kanesha Little, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 1/29/2021.(Freberg, B)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 1/27/2021.(Freberg, B)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 1/27/2021.(Freberg, B)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 3/28/2021; Discovery due by 7/29/2021; Dispositive Motions due by 9/2/2021. Signed by Clerk on 1/27/2021.(Freberg, B)
January 27, 2021 Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer added. (Oliver, T.)
January 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-6352831.), filed by Kanesha Little.(Lowry, Kirk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Little v. Gaiani et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hamilton Gaiani
Represented By: Jonathan B. Orleans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine Sacico
Represented By: Jonathan B. Orleans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phoenix 43 House
Represented By: Jonathan B. Orleans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alessandro Gaiani
Represented By: Jonathan B. Orleans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hamilton Hicks
Represented By: Jonathan B. Orleans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kanesha Little
Represented By: Kirk W. Lowry
Represented By: Virginia Martins Teixeira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?