Glynn v. Crane Co. et al
Plaintiff: Michael Glynn
Defendant: Foster Wheeler LLC, Crane Co., Viacom Inc., ViacomCBS Inc., Westinghouse Electric Corp and CBS Corporation
Case Number: 3:2021cv00144
Filed: February 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Robert N Chatigny
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2021 Filing 26 Joint STATUS REPORT of Counsel by Michael Glynn. (Arscott, Amity)
March 25, 2021 Set Deadlines: Status Report due by 6/25/2021. (Rickevicius, L.)
February 25, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephone Status Conference set for 6/24/2021 at 11:30 AM before Judge Robert N. Chatigny. Please use the following dial in information for the call. Dial in 866-434-5269, Access Code 8189198#. (Rickevicius, L.)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER: Please read full text of attached Order. Amended Pleadings due by 4/4/2021; Discovery due by 2/6/2022; Initial Status Report due by 3/25/2021; Settlement Conference 3/2022; Prefiling Conference Request Re: Dispositive Motions due by 12/24/2021; Trial Ready Date 5/7/2022; Trial Brief due by 4/7/2022. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 2/25/2021. (Rickevicius, L.)
February 19, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of Joinder re #1 Notice of Removal by Foster Wheeler LLC. Document #21 Corrected. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit)(Bozek, M.)
February 19, 2021 Filing 21 ENTERED IN ERROR: MOTION for Joinder in Removal of This Action by Foster Wheeler LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit)(Oswald, James) Modified on 3/22/2021 to mark as entered in error. Document is not a motion (Bozek, M.).
February 18, 2021 Filing 20 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Martin, Robert)
February 17, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE by ViacomCBS Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, Certificate of Compliance with Standing Order on Removed Cases (Martin, Robert)
February 16, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Joinder re #1 Notice of Removal, by Crane Co. Document #18 Corrected. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3 (1 of 6), #4 Exhibit 3 (2 of 6), #5 Exhibit 3 (3 of 6), #6 Exhibit 3 (4 of 6), #7 Exhibit 3 (5 of 6), #8 Exhibit 3 (6 of 6), #9 Exhibit 4 (1 of 5), #10 Exhibit 4 (2 of 5), #11 Exhibit 4 (3 of 5), #12 Exhibit 4 (4 of 5), #13 Exhibit 4 (5 of 5))(Bozek, M.)
February 16, 2021 Filing 18 ENTERED IN ERROR: MOTION for Joinder re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by ViacomCBS Inc. by Crane Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3 (1 of 6), #4 Exhibit 3 (2 of 6), #5 Exhibit 3 (3 of 6), #6 Exhibit 3 (4 of 6), #7 Exhibit 3 (5 of 6), #8 Exhibit 3 (6 of 6), #9 Exhibit 4 (1 of 5), #10 Exhibit 4 (2 of 5), #11 Exhibit 4 (3 of 5), #12 Exhibit 4 (4 of 5), #13 Exhibit 4 (5 of 5))(Lyons, Thomas) Modified on 3/22/2021 to mark as entered in error. Document is not a motion (Bozek, M.).
February 11, 2021 Filing 17 ANSWER to #16 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim by defendant Foster Wheeler, LLC by Crane Co..(Lyons, Thomas)
February 10, 2021 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Special Defenses with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against Crane Co. by Foster Wheeler LLC.(Oswald, James)
February 10, 2021 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Foster Wheeler LLC. (Oswald, James)
February 8, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly A. Kincaid on behalf of Foster Wheeler LLC (Kincaid, Kelly)
February 8, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by James R. Oswald on behalf of Foster Wheeler LLC (Oswald, James)
February 4, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #10 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by ViacomCBS Inc., #2 Notice of Appearance filed by ViacomCBS Inc., #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by ViacomCBS Inc., #3 Notice (Other) filed by ViacomCBS Inc., #5 Exhibit filed by ViacomCBS Inc., #11 Standing Protective Order, #9 Order on Pretrial Deadlines. Signed by Clerk on 2/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 STANDING ORDER ON REMOVED CASES)(Agati, Kathryn)
February 4, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Crane Co..(Lyons, Thomas)
February 4, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crane Co.. (Lyons, Thomas)
February 4, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas N. Lyons on behalf of Crane Co. (Lyons, Thomas)
February 4, 2021 Filing 5 EXHIBIT by ViacomCBS Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal. (Martin, Robert)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 2/3/2021. (Agati, Kathryn)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 2/3/2021. (Agati, Kathryn)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 4/4/2021, Discovery due by 8/5/2021, Dispositive Motions due by 9/9/2021. Signed by Clerk on 2/3/2021. (Agati, Kathryn)
February 3, 2021 Judge Robert N. Chatigny added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
February 3, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ViacomCBS Inc. identifying Corporate Parent National Amusements, Inc. for ViacomCBS Inc. (Martin, Robert) Modified on 2/4/2021 to correct party (Anastasio, F.).
February 3, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE by ViacomCBS Inc. of No Pending Motions (Martin, Robert) Modified on 2/4/2021 to correct party (Anastasio, F.).
February 3, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert F. Martin on behalf of ViacomCBS Inc. (Martin, Robert) Modified on 2/4/2021 to correct party (Anastasio, F.).
February 3, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ViacomCBS Inc. from Superior Court Judicial District of New London, case number KNL-cv-21-6049685-s. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACTDC-6365941, filed by ViacomCBS Inc.(Martin, Robert) Modified on 2/4/2021 to correct party (Anastasio, F.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glynn v. Crane Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler LLC
Represented By: James R. Oswald
Represented By: Kelly A. Kincaid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Thomas N. Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom Inc.
Represented By: Robert F. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ViacomCBS Inc.
Represented By: Robert F. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Electric Corp
Represented By: Robert F. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Robert F. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Glynn
Represented By: Amity L. Arscott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?