Medina v. Corsicana Bedding, LLC
Plaintiff: ancelmo medina
Defendant: Corsicana Bedding, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00151
Filed: February 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2615
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2021 Filing 20 Case remanded to State Court Judicial District of New Britain. (Imbriani, Susan)
March 16, 2021 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Perez, J.)
March 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER finding as moot #10 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. In light of the 18 Order, the #10 motion to dismiss is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 3/14/2021. (Tisdale, I.)
March 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Remand to State Court. In light of the parties' agreement to the dismissal of any federal claims in the case, see ECF No. #15 , the Court hereby dismisses all federal claims in this case. Under 28 USC 1445(c), "[a] civil action in any State court arising under the workmen's compensation laws of such State may not be removed to any district court of the United States." 28 USC 1445(c); see Miley v. Hous. Auth. of City of Bridgeport, 926 F. Supp. 2d 420, 428 (D. Conn. 2013) ("[A] plain reading of 1445(c) supports the conclusion that it prohibits removal of a state workers' compensation claim...."). Accordingly, this case shall be remanded to the Connecticut Superior Court, Judicial District of New Britain. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 3/14/2021. (Tisdale, I.)
March 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Confer and File 26(f) Report of Planning Meeting. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 3/14/2021. (Tisdale, I.)
March 10, 2021 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. In light of the parties' recent filings and the pending ruling from the Court related to them, the status conference scheduled for March 11, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. is hereby CANCELLED. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 3/10/2021. (Tisdale, I.)
March 8, 2021 Filing 16 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Confer and File 26(f) Report of Planning Meeting by Ancelmo Medina. (Paradisi, Matthew)
March 8, 2021 Filing 15 RESPONSE re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Ancelmo Medina. (Paradisi, Matthew)
March 5, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. NOTICE regarding hearing via Zoom: The Conference scheduled for March 11, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. will be conducted via Zoom. The video link is https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1604810604?pwd=U1AzOWZqYkpRNkhtU2pqMXhLd1lUdz09 and call in number is +1 646 828 7666.Meeting ID: 160 481 0604 Meeting Password: 935402Please note: Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, screenshots, streaming, and rebroadcasting in any form, of court proceedings. The Judicial Conference of the United States, which governs the practices of the federal courts, has prohibited it. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court. (Tisdale, I.)
March 4, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE by Corsicana Bedding, LLC re #12 MOTION to Remand to State Court , or In the Alternative, Sever and Remand (Greenspon, Amanda)
February 12, 2021 Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/22/2021. (Perez, J.)
February 11, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand to State Court , or In the Alternative, Sever and Remand by Ancelmo Medina.Responses due by 3/4/2021 (Paradisi, Matthew)
February 11, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Emanuele Robert Cicchiello on behalf of Ancelmo Medina (Cicchiello, Emanuele)
February 11, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Corsicana Bedding, LLC.Responses due by 3/4/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Greenspon, Amanda)
February 5, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Notice of Removal filed by Corsicana Bedding, LLC, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Corsicana Bedding, LLC, #8 Standing Protective Order, #6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Amanda K. Greenspon on behalf of Corsicana Bedding, LLC, #7 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Statement Regarding Removal filed by Corsicana Bedding, LLC, #5 Notice of Pending Motions filed by Corsicana Bedding, LLC Signed by Clerk on 02/5/2021. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order)(Fazekas, J.)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 02/4/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 02/4/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 4/5/2021. Discovery due by 8/6/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 9/10/2021. Signed by Clerk on 02/4/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
February 4, 2021 Judge Victor A. Bolden added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
February 4, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE by Corsicana Bedding, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal (Greenspon, Amanda)
February 4, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE by Corsicana Bedding, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal (Greenspon, Amanda)
February 4, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Corsicana Bedding, LLC. (Greenspon, Amanda)
February 4, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda K. Greenspon on behalf of Corsicana Bedding, LLC (Greenspon, Amanda)
February 4, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Corsicana Bedding, LLC Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACTDC-6368084, filed by Corsicana Bedding, LLC.(Greenspon, Amanda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Medina v. Corsicana Bedding, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ancelmo medina
Represented By: Matthew D. Paradisi
Represented By: Emanuele Robert Cicchiello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corsicana Bedding, LLC
Represented By: Amanda K. Greenspon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?