Mohamad v. Automated Logic Contracting Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Moein Mohamad
Defendant: Automated Logic Contracting Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00152
Filed: February 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2021 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Discovery due by 11/12/2021; Dispositive Motions due by 12/30/2021; Joint Status Report due by 8/25/2021; Joint Trial Brief due by 2/18/2022; Telephonic Status Conference set for 9/1/2021 04:00 PM before Judge Michael P. Shea (Johnson, D.)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER. The Court has reviewed the parties' (ECF No. 15) Rule 26(f) Report and orders the deadlines set forth in the attached. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 4/1/2021.(Gait, Emily)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER. The (ECF No. #17 ) motion for extension of time is GRANTED. The initial discovery response deadline is extended by thirty days. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 3/12/2021. (Gait, Emily)
March 11, 2021 Filing 17 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until April 15, 2021 Initial Discovery Protocol Responses by Automated Logic Contracting Services, Inc.. (Brady, Kevin)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Initial Discovery Protocol Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 3/11/21.(Johnson, D.)
March 10, 2021 Filing 15 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Michaud, Megan)
February 12, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Automated Logic Contracting Services, Inc..(Brady, Kevin)
February 12, 2021 Filing 13 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Moein Mohamad. (Michaud, Megan)
February 12, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Emanuele Robert Cicchiello on behalf of Moein Mohamad (Cicchiello, Emanuele)
February 8, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #8 Electronic Filing Order, #3 Certificate of Service filed by Automated Logic Contracting Services, Inc., #5 Notice of Appearance filed by Automated Logic Contracting Services, Inc., #7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Notice (Other) filed by Automated Logic Contracting Services, Inc., #10 Notice, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Automated Logic Contracting Services, Inc., #6 Notice of Appearance filed by Automated Logic Contracting Services, Inc., #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Automated Logic Contracting Services, Inc., #9 Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 02/08/2021. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases) (Peterson, M)
February 5, 2021 Filing 10 Notice re Initial Discovery Protocols Signed by Clerk on 02/05/2021. (Attachments: #1 Initial Discovery Protocols Attachment) (Peterson, M)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 02/05/2021. (Peterson, M)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 02/05/2021. (Peterson, M)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 4/6/2021. Discovery due by 8/7/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 9/11/2021. Signed by Clerk on 02/05/2021. (Peterson, M)
February 5, 2021 Judge Michael P. Shea added. (Oliver, T.)
February 5, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony S. Califano on behalf of Automated Logic Contracting Services, Inc. (Califano, Anthony)
February 5, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin R. Brady on behalf of Automated Logic Contracting Services, Inc. (Brady, Kevin)
February 5, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE by Automated Logic Contracting Services, Inc. of No Pending Motions (Brady, Kevin)
February 5, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Automated Logic Contracting Services, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, and Certificate of Filing (Brady, Kevin)
February 5, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Automated Logic Contracting Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Carrier Corporation for Automated Logic Contracting Services, Inc.. (Brady, Kevin)
February 5, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Automated Logic Contracting Services, Inc. from Superior Court, Judicial District of New Haven, Connecticut, case number NNH-CV-21-6110664-S. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACTDC-6369517, filed by Automated Logic Contracting Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brady, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mohamad v. Automated Logic Contracting Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Automated Logic Contracting Services, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony S. Califano
Represented By: Kevin R. Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moein Mohamad
Represented By: Megan Leigh Michaud
Represented By: Emanuele Robert Cicchiello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?