Tyson v. New Haven et al
Plaintiff: Deshawn Tyson
Defendant: Dan Renstrom, Leeha Timm, Curtis Miller, City of New Haven, Joe Dease and Lucille Roach
Case Number: 3:2021cv00326
Filed: March 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. If you change your address at any time during the litigation of this case, Local Rule 83.1(c)2 provides that you notify the court. Failure to do so can result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Farrish on 4/16/21. (Payton, R.)
April 15, 2021 Filing 14 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Deshawn Tyson. (Payton, R.)
April 15, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE to Court for Submission of Trust Account Statement by Deshawn Tyson (Payton, R.)
April 13, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE to Court re plaintiff indigent forms by Deshawn Tyson (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Freberg, B)
April 12, 2021 Filing 11 Notice to petitioner re: Insufficiency #10 Ledger Sheet. You must submit a Ledger sheet showing the past six months transactions (deposits and withdrawls). If insufficiency not corrected Dismissal due by 5/4/2021 Signed by Judge Thomas O. Farrish on 4/12/21.(Payton, R.)
April 9, 2021 Filing 10 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Deshawn Tyson. (Payton, R.)
April 9, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE to Court by Deshawn Tyson (Payton, R.)
March 26, 2021 Filing 8 Notice to petitioner re: Insufficiency #3 Ledger Sheet. You must submit a Ledger Sheet showing the past six months transactions. If insufficiency not corrected Dismissal due by 4/16/2021 Signed by Judge Thomas O. Farrish on 3/26/21.(Payton, R.)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER ON PRISONER ELECTRONIC FILING PROGRAM. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 3/12/2021.(Freberg, B)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 3/12/2021.(Freberg, B)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 3/12/2021.(Freberg, B)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 5/11/2021 Discovery due by 9/11/2021 Dispositive Motions due by 10/16/2021 Signed by Clerk on 3/12/2021.(Freberg, B)
March 12, 2021 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Deshawn Tyson. (Freberg, B)
March 12, 2021 Filing 2 PRISCS - MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Deshawn Tyson. (Freberg, B)
March 12, 2021 Filing 1 PRISCS - COMPLAINT against Joe Dease, Curtis Miller, City of New Haven, Dan Renstrom, Lucille Roach, Leeha Timm, filed by Deshawn Tyson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Freberg, B)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tyson v. New Haven et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Renstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leeha Timm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New Haven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Dease
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucille Roach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deshawn Tyson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?