Rodriguez v. Saul
Plaintiff: Carmen Rodriguez
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2021cv00327
Filed: March 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Sarah A L Merriam
Referring Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Consent Motion for Extension of Time until June 24, 2021, to file the ECAR. The Court does not anticipate granting further extensions of this deadline. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 5/5/2021. (Katz, S.)
May 5, 2021 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until June 24, 2021 to file the ECAR by Andrew M. Saul. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of the Executive Director of the Social Security Administration)Motions referred to Sarah A. L. Merriam(Everhart, Kristin)
May 5, 2021 Answer deadline updated for Andrew M. Saul to 6/24/2021. (Katz, S.)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. On March 12, 2021, the Clerk of the Court provided a copy of the Complaint to defendant by electronic mail, in accordance with the Standing Scheduling Order (Doc. #5 at 2). Defendant shall file a copy of the Administrative Transcript on or before May 10, 2021. As counsel are aware, the 60-day deadline for filing of the Administrative Transcript constitutes an extension of the otherwise applicable deadlines in civil cases; as such, requests for extensions of time are discouraged, and unless circumstances dictate otherwise, counsel should generally not seek extensions. Counsel for defendant is hereby placed on notice that if any motion for an extension of time to file the Administrative Transcript is filed, such motion must set forth the date on which counsel requested the preparation of the transcript. That information will help the Court assess the diligence of defendant, and thus, whether any extension of the filing deadline is warranted. See D. Conn. L. Civ. R. 7(b)(1) (providing that "good cause" for extension of a deadline "requires a particularized showing that the" deadline cannot be met "despite the diligence" of the moving party). It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 4/15/2021.(Katz, S.)
April 15, 2021 Filing 10 Absent consent to a Magistrate Judge, this case has been referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam for all purposes including issuing a Recommended Ruling. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 4/15/2021.(Anastasio, F.)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REMINDER: STANDING ORDER ON SOCIAL SECURITY APPEALS Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 3/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Anastasio, F.)
March 29, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Everhart Kristin on behalf of Andrew M. Saul (Kristin, Everhart) Modified on 3/30/2021 to correct party (Anastasio, F.).
March 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff has filed a motion seeking to proceed without payment of fees and costs, which motion includes a sworn statement as to plaintiff's current financial circumstances. See Doc. #3 . Plaintiff has completed the required information. Plaintiff asserts that she is unable to afford to pay fees and costs, having no income and minimal assets. See generally id. at 3-5. At this stage, such allegations are sufficient to establish that plaintiff is unable to pay the ordinary filing fees required by the Court. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(1). Accordingly, plaintiff's #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 3/14/2021. (Katz, S.)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 3/11/2021. (Reis, Julia)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING SCHEDULING ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 3/11/2021. (Reis, Julia)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Standing Order on Social Security Appeals Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 3/11/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Reis, Julia)
March 11, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Carmen Rodriguez. (Reis, Julia)
March 11, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Ivan Michael Katz on behalf of Carmen Rodriguez (Reis, Julia)
March 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul, filed by Carmen Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Reis, Julia)
March 11, 2021 Answer deadline updated for Andrew M. Saul to 5/10/2021. (Reis, Julia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Kristin Everhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Rodriguez
Represented By: Ivan Michael Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?