Reiner et al v. AIG Property Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Sheila Reiner and Michael Reiner
Defendant: AIG Property Casualty Company
Case Number: 3:2021cv00387
Filed: March 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Defendant's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by AIG Property Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Blatchley, Aubrey)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time. A response shall be due on or before April 19, 2021. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 3/24/2021. (Banker, Joshua)
March 24, 2021 Answer deadline updated for AIG Property Casualty Company to 4/19/2021. (Banker, Joshua)
March 23, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Pollard Thompson on behalf of AIG Property Casualty Company (Thompson, Michael)
March 23, 2021 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until April 19, 2021 to file a responsive pleading by AIG Property Casualty Company. (Blatchley, Aubrey)
March 22, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Notice of Pending Motions filed by AIG Property Casualty Company, #7 Electronic Filing Order, #8 Standing Protective Order, #4 Notice of Appearance filed by Aubrey E. Blatchley on behalf of AIG Property Casualty Company, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by AIG Property Casualty Company, #5 Corporate Disclosure Statement, filed by AIG Property Casualty Company, #3 Certificate of Compliance with Standing Order on Removed Cases filed by AIG Property Casualty Company, #6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 03/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order)(Fazekas, J.)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 03/22/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 03/22/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 5/21/2021. Discovery due by 9/21/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 10/26/2021. Signed by Clerk on 03/22/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
March 20, 2021 Judge Kari A. Dooley added. (Oliver, T.)
March 20, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AIG Property Casualty Company identifying Other Affiliate AIG Property Casualty U.S., Inc., Other Affiliate AIG Property Casualty Company Inc., Other Affiliate American International Group, Inc. for AIG Property Casualty Company. (Blatchley, Aubrey)
March 20, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Aubrey E. Blatchley on behalf of AIG Property Casualty Company (Blatchley, Aubrey)
March 20, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE by AIG Property Casualty Company Certificate of Compliance with Standing Order on Removed Cases (Blatchley, Aubrey)
March 20, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE by AIG Property Casualty Company Notice of Pending Motions (Blatchley, Aubrey)
March 20, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AIG Property Casualty Company from Connecticut Superior Court, case number HHD-CV21-6139396-S. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACTDC-6439721, filed by AIG Property Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Blatchley, Aubrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reiner et al v. AIG Property Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Reiner
Represented By: Michael D. Reiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Reiner
Represented By: Michael D. Reiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIG Property Casualty Company
Represented By: Aubrey E. Blatchley
Represented By: Michael Pollard Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?