Ashfield Health LLC v. Jacobson
Plaintiff: Ashfield Health LLC
Defendant: Matthew Jacobson
Petitioner: Apollo Medical Communications, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00417
Filed: March 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2021 Answer deadline updated for Matthew Jacobson to 6/25/2021. (Perez, J.)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting #58 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall have until June 25, 2021 to file a responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 5/20/2021. (Tisdale, I.)
May 20, 2021 Filing 59 Memorandum in Opposition re #58 MOTION for Extension of Time until June 25, 2021 to file a responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint #1 Complaint, filed by Ashfield Health LLC. (Brazzano, Rebecca)
May 19, 2021 Filing 58 MOTION for Extension of Time until June 25, 2021 to file a responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint #1 Complaint, by Matthew Jacobson. (Zakrzewski, Steven)
May 14, 2021 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Justyn P. Stokely on behalf of Matthew Jacobson (Stokely, Justyn)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting #53 Motion to Seal. The Court finds that good cause exists to seal these documents and that sealing is supported by clear and compelling reasons and is narrowly tailored to serve those reasons. See D. Conn. L. Civ. R. 5(e). Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 5/13/2021. (Tisdale, I.)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER. In preparation for the evidentiary hearing on Monday, May 17, 2021, beginning at 9:30 a.m., the parties jointly shall submit a witness and exhibit list by May 14, 2021 at 5:00 p.m. A copy of each exhibit should be placed in an exhibit binder and provided to the Court by that same deadline to the Chambers of the presiding judge. For the in-person proceeding on Monday, two additional copies of each exhibit should be provided for the convenience of the Court. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 05/13/2021. (Millat, C.)
May 12, 2021 Filing 54 Sealed Document: Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and certain Exhibits by Ashfield Health LLC re #53 MOTION to Seal Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and certain Exhibits (ECF No. 52) Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Ord, #52 Reply to Response to Motion, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 9, #9 Exhibit 10, #10 Exhibit 11, #11 Exhibit 12, #12 Exhibit 13, #13 Exhibit 16, #14 Exhibit 17, #15 Exhibit 18, #16 Exhibit 19, #17 Exhibit 20, #18 Exhibit 21, #19 Exhibit 22, #20 Exhibit 23, #21 Exhibit 26, #22 Exhibit 28, #23 Exhibit 31)(Brazzano, Rebecca)
May 12, 2021 Filing 53 MOTION to Seal Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and certain Exhibits (ECF No. 52) Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and certain Exhibits by Ashfield Health LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Brazzano, Rebecca)
May 12, 2021 Filing 52 REPLY to Response to #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (REDACTED) filed by Ashfield Health LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-7, #2 Exhibit 8, #3 Exhibits 9-13, #4 Exhibit 14, #5 Exhibit 15, #6 Exhibits 16-23, #7 Exhibit 24, #8 Exhibits 25-26, #9 Exhibit 27, #10 Exhibit 28, #11 Exhibit 29, #12 Exhibit 30, #13 Exhibit 31)(Brazzano, Rebecca)
May 11, 2021 Filing 51 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Type of Hearing: Discovery Conference. Held on 4/23/21 before Judge Victor Bolden. Court Reporter: Sharon Montini. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 6/1/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/11/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/9/2021. (Montini, S.)
April 28, 2021 Filing 50 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. RESET FROM April 30, 2021 Evidentiary Hearing set for May 17, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. before Judge Victor A. Bolden. The hearing scheduled for April 30, 2021 is CANCELLED. (Tisdale, I.)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER. In light of the #48 order proposed by the parties, the Court hereby directs the parties to follow the instructions detailed in the attached Order. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 4/28/2021. (Tisdale, I.)
April 27, 2021 Filing 48 PROPOSED ORDER Adjourning Evidentiary Hearing and Enjoining Defendant Matthew Jacobson by Ashfield Health LLC. (Brazzano, Rebecca)
April 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #45 Motion to Seal. The Court finds that good cause exists to seal these documents and that sealing is supported by clear and compelling reasons and is narrowly tailored to serve those reasons. See D. Conn. L. Civ. R. 5(e). Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 4/25/2021. (Tisdale, I.)
April 23, 2021 Filing 46 Sealed Document: Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Order to Show Cause Seeking Temporary Restraints and Preliminary Injunction (the Opposition), and Exhibit C to the Opposition (Exhibit C) by Matthew Jacobson re #45 MOTION to Seal Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Order to Show Cause Seeking Temporary Restraints and Preliminary Injunction (the Opposition), and Exhibit C to the Opposition (Exhibit C), #44 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C)(Zakrzewski, Steven)
April 23, 2021 Filing 45 MOTION to Seal Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Order to Show Cause Seeking Temporary Restraints and Preliminary Injunction (the Opposition), and Exhibit C to the Opposition (Exhibit C) by Matthew Jacobson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Zakrzewski, Steven)
April 23, 2021 Filing 44 Memorandum in Opposition re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Matthew Jacobson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Matthew Jacobson, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Zakrzewski, Steven)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER denying #36 Motion to Compel. Based on the discussion during the 42 discovery conference held on April 23, 2021, the #36 motion to compel is denied without prejudice, and subject to renewal following the #34 evidentiary hearing taking place on April 30, 2021. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 4/23/2021. (Tisdale, I.)
April 23, 2021 Filing 42 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Victor A. Bolden: Discovery Conference held on 4/23/2021. Total Time: 46 minutes (Court Reporter S. Montini) (Tisdale, I.) Modified on 4/23/2021 to correct type of hearing (Perez, J.).
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #40 Motion for Attorney Paul Erian to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 6/22/2021. Signed by Clerk on 4/23/2021. (Oliver, T.)
April 22, 2021 Filing 40 MOTION for Attorney(s) Paul Erian to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6481464) by Apollo Medical Communications, Inc.. (Reardon, James)
April 22, 2021 Filing 39 Memorandum in Support re #36 MOTION to Compel Non-Party Apollo Medical Communications, Inc. filed by Apollo Medical Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Reardon, James)
April 22, 2021 Filing 38 AFFIDAVIT re #36 MOTION to Compel Non-Party Apollo Medical Communications, Inc. Signed By Rebecca Brazzano filed by Ashfield Health LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Subpoena, #2 Exhibit B - Subpoena affidavit of service, #3 Exhibit C - Apollo Medical Communications, Inc. DE Incorporation, #4 Exhibit D - Apollo letter dated April 20, 2021)(Brazzano, Rebecca)
April 22, 2021 Filing 37 Memorandum in Support re #36 MOTION to Compel Non-Party Apollo Medical Communications, Inc. filed by Ashfield Health LLC. (Brazzano, Rebecca)
April 22, 2021 Filing 36 MOTION to Compel Non-Party Apollo Medical Communications, Inc. by Ashfield Health LLC.Responses due by 5/13/2021 (Brazzano, Rebecca)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER: The Court hereby suspends its normal page limits for any filings related to the discovery conference taking place on April 23, 2021. The filings must comply with all other rules. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 4/22/2021. (Tisdale, I.)
April 22, 2021 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Sandlin on behalf of Ashfield Health LLC (Sandlin, Benjamin)
April 22, 2021 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by George Musekamp on behalf of Ashfield Health LLC (Musekamp, George)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #28 Motion for Conference. The Court will convene a discovery conference on April 23, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. over Zoom. Any filings related to the discovery conference are due by April 22, 2021 at 7:00 p.m. Zoom information to follow. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 04/22/2021. (Millat, C.)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #30 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Katharine Liao, Esq. Certificate of Good Standing due by 6/21/2021. Signed by Clerk on 4/22/2021. (Imbriani, Susan)
April 22, 2021 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. The Discovery Conference scheduled for April 23, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. will be conducted via Zoom. The video link is https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1610927904?pwd=SThYR0tqbmdtbWtXZFI1U0l2OTA0Zz09 and call in number is +1-646-828-7666.Meeting ID: 161 092 7904 Meeting Password: 056224Please note: Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, screenshots, streaming, and rebroadcasting in any form, of court proceedings. The Judicial Conference of the United States, which governs the practices of the federal courts, has prohibited it. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court. (Tisdale, I.)
April 21, 2021 Filing 30 MOTION for Attorney(s) Katharine Liao to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6479260) by Apollo Medical Communications, Inc.. (Reardon, James)
April 21, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by James J. Reardon, Jr on behalf of Apollo Medical Communications, Inc. Non-Party Subpoena Respondent (Reardon, James)
April 21, 2021 Filing 28 Joint MOTION for Discovery Conference by Ashfield Health LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order Setting Discovery Conference)(Brazzano, Rebecca)
April 21, 2021 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #25 MOTION for Attorney(s) Benjamin G. Sandlin to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6475970) by Ashfield Health LLC. (Brazzano, Rebecca)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Benjamin G. Sandlin, Esq. Certificate of Good Standing due by 6/19/2021. Signed by Clerk on 4/20/2021. (Imbriani, Susan)
April 19, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION for Attorney(s) Benjamin G. Sandlin to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6475970) by Ashfield Health LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Sandlin Affidavit)(Brazzano, Rebecca)
April 1, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Evidentiary Hearing set for April 30, 2021 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom Two, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Victor A. Bolden. (Tisdale, I.)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER re #22 Proposed Order filed by Ashfield Health LLC. The Court hereby adopts the attached Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 4/1/2021. (Tisdale, I.)
March 31, 2021 Filing 22 PROPOSED ORDER re 20 Order, (REVISED) by Ashfield Health LLC. (Brazzano, Rebecca)
March 31, 2021 Filing 21 PROPOSED ORDER re 20 Order, by Ashfield Health LLC. (Brazzano, Rebecca)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER. The parties have until 5 p.m. on March 31, 2021 to file an expedited schedule for discovery on the pending #3 motion for a temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction, as well as a proposed hearing date. If the parties are unable to come to an agreement, they must each file a proposed expedited schedule for discovery and hearing date for the Court's review. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 3/30/2021. (Tisdale, I.)
March 30, 2021 Filing 19 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Victor A. Bolden: Telephonic Status Conference held on 3/30/2021. Total Time: 0 hours and 27 minutes (Court Reporter S. Montini) (Tisdale, I.)
March 30, 2021 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #11 MOTION for Attorney(s) George B. Musekamp to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6448371) by Ashfield Health LLC. (Brazzano, Rebecca)
March 30, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven J Zakrzewski on behalf of Matthew Jacobson (Zakrzewski, Steven)
March 30, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Mitchell L. Fishberg on behalf of Matthew Jacobson (Fishberg, Mitchell)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for George B. Musekamp, Esq. Certificate of Good Standing due by 5/28/2021. Signed by Clerk on 3/29/2021. (Imbriani, Susan)
March 27, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Status Conference set for March 30, 2021 at 03:00 PM. Dial: (888) 808-6929; Participant Code: 9284309; Bypass the prompt for a security code. (Tisdale, I.)
March 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Conference. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 3/27/2021. (Tisdale, I.)
March 26, 2021 Filing 12 Joint MOTION for Telephonic Status Conference by Ashfield Health LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Brazzano, Rebecca)
March 26, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Attorney(s) George B. Musekamp to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6448371) by Ashfield Health LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of George B. Musekamp)(Brazzano, Rebecca)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Counsel for Plaintiff is directed to determine whether Defendant is represented by counsel and, if so, to seek by motion a telephonic status conference with the Court regarding Plaintiffs' pending motions, at a time convenient for both parties. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 3/26/2021. (Tisdale, I.)
March 25, 2021 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Matthew Jacobson* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Rebecca Anne Brazzano* *Thompson Hine, LLP-NY* *335 Madison Avenue, 12th Fl.* *New York, NY 10017*. (Imbriani, Susan)
March 25, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Ashfield Health LLC, #6 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint, filed by Ashfield Health LLC, #4 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Ashfield Health LLC, #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Ashfield Health LLC, #7 Protective Order, #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 3/25/2021.(Imbriani, Susan)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 3/25/2021.(Imbriani, Susan)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 3/25/2021.(Imbriani, Susan)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 5/24/2021; Discovery due by 9/24/2021; Dispositive Motions due by 10/29/2021. Signed by Clerk on 3/25/2021.(Imbriani, Susan)
March 25, 2021 Judge Victor A. Bolden added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
March 25, 2021 Filing 4 Memorandum in Support re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Ashfield Health LLC. (Brazzano, Rebecca)
March 25, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Responses due by 4/15/2021, ) by Ashfield Health LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order to Show Cause)(Brazzano, Rebecca)
March 25, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Anne Brazzano on behalf of Ashfield Health LLC (Brazzano, Rebecca)
March 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Matthew Jacobson ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-6446612.), filed by Ashfield Health LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Employment Agreement, #3 Exhibit B - Emails, #4 Exhibit C - Resignation Letter, #5 Exhibit D - February 18, 2021)(Brazzano, Rebecca)
March 25, 2021 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Matthew Jacobson. (Brazzano, Rebecca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ashfield Health LLC v. Jacobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Jacobson
Represented By: Mitchell L. Fishberg
Represented By: Steven J Zakrzewski
Represented By: Justyn P. Stokely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashfield Health LLC
Represented By: Rebecca Anne Brazzano
Represented By: George Musekamp
Represented By: Benjamin Sandlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Apollo Medical Communications, Inc.
Represented By: James J. Reardon, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?