Edgewood Elm Housing, Inc. et al v. Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast et al
Plaintiff: Edgewood Elm Housing, Inc., Yedidei Hagan, Inc. and Edgewood Village, Inc.
Defendant: Selective Insurance Company of America, Clocktower Tax Credits, LLC, Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast, Jeff Jacobson and Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina
Case Number: 3:2021cv00457
Filed: April 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2021 Filing 27 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Nugent, Amanda)
May 28, 2021 Filing 26 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Yedidei Hagan, Inc., Edgewood Village, Inc., Edgewood Elm Housing, Inc..(Nugent, Amanda)
May 10, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss Count Two of the Complaint by Selective Insurance Company of America, Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina, Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast.Responses due by 5/31/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Dwyer, Gerald)
May 7, 2021 Filing 24 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until June 1, 2021 to hold Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting and File Report Thereof by Edgewood Elm Housing, Inc., Edgewood Village, Inc., Yedidei Hagan, Inc.. (Nugent, Amanda)
May 7, 2021 Filing 23 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) and Affirmative Defenses by Clocktower Tax Credits, LLC, Jeff Jacobson.(Fletcher, Liza)
May 3, 2021 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Edgewood Elm Housing, Inc., Edgewood Village, Inc., Yedidei Hagan, Inc.. (Nugent, Amanda)
May 3, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda C. Nugent on behalf of Edgewood Elm Housing, Inc., Edgewood Village, Inc., Yedidei Hagan, Inc. (Nugent, Amanda)
April 26, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles F. Modzelewski on behalf of Selective Insurance Company of America, Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina, Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast (Modzelewski, Charles)
April 26, 2021 Filing 19 Amended EXHIBIT 1 to Notice of Removal by Selective Insurance Company of America, Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina, Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Dwyer, Gerald)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast, Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina, and Selective Insurance Company of Ameerica shall have until May 10, 2021 to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 4/9/2021. (Tisdale, I.)
April 9, 2021 Filing 17 CORRECTION re ECF No. 16 : Defendants Clocktower Tax Credits, LLC and Jeff Jacobson shall have until May 8, 2021 to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 4/9/2021. (Tisdale, I.)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall have until May 8, 2021 to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 4/9/2021. (Tisdale, I.)
April 8, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE by Selective Insurance Company of America, Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina, Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast of Compliance with Standing Order in Removed Cases (Dwyer, Gerald)
April 8, 2021 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until May 10, 2021 Answer or otherwise plead to Complaint by Selective Insurance Company of America, Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina, Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast. (Dwyer, Gerald)
April 8, 2021 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement Rule 7.1 Statement by Clocktower Tax Credits, LLC, Jeff Jacobson. (Milano, Mark)
April 8, 2021 Filing 12 First MOTION for Extension of Time until May 8, 2021 to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint #1 Notice of Removal, by Clocktower Tax Credits, LLC, Jeff Jacobson. (Milano, Mark)
April 6, 2021 Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/17/2021 (Perez, J.)
April 1, 2021 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Selective Insurance Company of America, Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina, Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast identifying Corporate Parent Selective Insurance Group, Inc. for Selective Insurance Company of America, Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina, Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast. (Dwyer, Gerald)
April 1, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE by Clocktower Tax Credits, LLC, Jeff Jacobson of Consent to Removal (Milano, Mark)
April 1, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Liza M. Fletcher on behalf of Clocktower Tax Credits, LLC, Jeff Jacobson (Fletcher, Liza)
April 1, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark A. Milano on behalf of Clocktower Tax Credits, LLC, Jeff Jacobson (Milano, Mark)
April 1, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #6 Standing Protective Order, #3 Notice of Pending Motions filed by Selective Insurance Company of America, Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina, Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast, #5 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Selective Insurance Company of America, Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina, Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast, #2 Notice to Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Court filed by Selective Insurance Company of America, Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina, Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast Signed by Clerk on 04/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order)(Fazekas, J.)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 04/1/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 04/1/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 5/31/2021. Discovery due by 10/1/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 11/5/2021. Signed by Clerk on 04/1/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
April 1, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE by Selective Insurance Company of America, Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina, Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast of Pending Motions (Dwyer, Gerald)
April 1, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE by Selective Insurance Company of America, Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina, Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast to Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dwyer, Gerald)
April 1, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast, Selective Insurance Company of America, Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina from Connecticut Superior Court, case number TBA. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACTDC-6455251, filed by Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast, Selective Insurance Company of America, Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Dwyer, Gerald)
April 1, 2021 Judge Victor A. Bolden added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edgewood Elm Housing, Inc. et al v. Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selective Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Gerald P. Dwyer, Jr.
Represented By: Charles F. Modzelewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clocktower Tax Credits, LLC
Represented By: Liza M. Fletcher
Represented By: Mark A. Milano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast
Represented By: Gerald P. Dwyer, Jr.
Represented By: Charles F. Modzelewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Jacobson
Represented By: Liza M. Fletcher
Represented By: Mark A. Milano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina
Represented By: Gerald P. Dwyer, Jr.
Represented By: Charles F. Modzelewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edgewood Elm Housing, Inc.
Represented By: David T. Grudberg
Represented By: Amanda C. Nugent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yedidei Hagan, Inc.
Represented By: David T. Grudberg
Represented By: Amanda C. Nugent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edgewood Village, Inc.
Represented By: David T. Grudberg
Represented By: Amanda C. Nugent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?