Kennedy v. Elite Auto Rentals, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Chontayvia Kennedy
Defendant: LTO Holdings, LLC and Elite Auto Rentals, LLC doing business as Ace Rent A Car
Counter Claimant: Elite Auto Rentals, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00471
Filed: April 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet Bond Arterton
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1640
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2021 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LTO Holdings, LLC. (Greene, Gary)
May 6, 2021 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Elite Auto Rentals, LLC. (Greene, Gary)
May 5, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses , COUNTERCLAIM against Chontayvia Kennedy by LTO Holdings, LLC, Elite Auto Rentals, LLC.(Greene, Gary)
April 29, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary Joseph Greene on behalf of Elite Auto Rentals, LLC, LTO Holdings, LLC (Greene, Gary)
April 22, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chontayvia Kennedy. Elite Auto Rentals, LLC served on 4/16/2021, answer due 5/7/2021. (Blinn, Daniel)
April 22, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chontayvia Kennedy. LTO Holdings, LLC served on 4/16/2021, answer due 5/7/2021. (Blinn, Daniel)
April 6, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Elite Auto Rentals, LLC, LTO Holdings, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Daniel S. Blinn* *Consumer Law Group* *35 Cold Spring Rd., Suite 512* *Rocky Hill, CT 06067*. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
April 6, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Protective Order, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by Chontayvia Kennedy, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 4/6/2021.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 4/5/2021.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 4/5/2021.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/4/2021 Discovery due by 10/5/2021 Dispositive Motions due by 11/9/2021 Signed by Clerk on 4/5/2021.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
April 5, 2021 Judge Janet Bond Arterton added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
April 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Elite Auto Rentals, LLC, LTO Holdings, LLC ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-6459450.), filed by Chontayvia Kennedy.(Blinn, Daniel)
April 5, 2021 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Elite Auto Rentals, LLC. (Blinn, Daniel)
April 5, 2021 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to LTO Holdings, LLC. (Blinn, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kennedy v. Elite Auto Rentals, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LTO Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Gary Joseph Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elite Auto Rentals, LLC doing business as Ace Rent A Car
Represented By: Gary Joseph Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chontayvia Kennedy
Represented By: Daniel S. Blinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Elite Auto Rentals, LLC
Represented By: Gary Joseph Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?