Jensen v. Rubin et al
Plaintiff: Mathew Jensen
Defendant: Michael Asmeram, Rolando Rodriguez, Marlene Rubin, Mark Odyneir and Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 3:2021cv00482
Filed: April 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2021 Filing 37 RESPONSE re #33 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Mathew Jensen. (Freberg, B)
May 14, 2021 Filing 38 RESPONSE re #18 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Mathew Jensen. (Freberg, B)
May 14, 2021 Filing 36 NOTICE of Change of Address by Mathew Jensen. (Fanelle, N.)
May 13, 2021 Filing 35 RESPONSE re #28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim filed by Mathew Jensen. (Reis, Julia)
May 12, 2021 Filing 34 NOTICE by Rolando Rodriguez re #33 MOTION to Dismiss as Required by Local Rule 12(a) (Vellturo, Colleen)
May 12, 2021 Filing 33 MOTION to Dismiss by Rolando Rodriguez.Responses due by 6/2/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Vellturo, Colleen)
May 11, 2021 Filing 32 REPLY to Response to #18 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Mark Odyneir. (Shearin, James)
May 10, 2021 Filing 31 REPLY to Response to #15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Michael Asmeram. (Lacombe, Elizabeth)
May 5, 2021 Filing 30 MOTION for Chapter 927 Survival of Actions by Mathew Jensen. (Freberg, B)
May 5, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE by Marlene Rubin, Andrew M. Saul re #28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim - Notice Pursuant to L. Civ. R. 12(a) (Attachments: #1 D. Conn. L. Civ. R. 7, #2 Fed. R. Civ. P. 12)(Elicker, Natalie)
May 5, 2021 Filing 28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim by Marlene Rubin, Andrew M. Saul.Responses due by 5/26/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Elicker, Natalie)
April 30, 2021 Filing 27 RESPONSE to Motion to Dismiss by Marlene Rubin filed by Mathew Jensen. (Reis, Julia)
April 29, 2021 Filing 26 RESPONSE to Motion to Dismiss by Mark Odyneir, filed by Mathew Jensen. (Reis, Julia)
April 29, 2021 Filing 25 RESPONSE re #18 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Mathew Jensen. (Reis, Julia)
April 27, 2021 Filing 24 RESPONSE re #15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Mathew Jensen. (Reis, Julia)
April 23, 2021 Answer deadline updated for Marlene Rubin and Andrew M. Saul to 5/13/2021. (Barry, Donna)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time until May 13, 2021 to File Responsive Pleading. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 4/23/2021. (Simon, K.)
April 22, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time until 5/13/2021 to Respond to #1 Notice of Removal, by Marlene Rubin, Andrew M. Saul. (Elicker, Natalie)
April 20, 2021 Answer deadline updated for Mark Odyneir and Rolando Rodriguez to 5/13/2021. (Barry, Donna)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER denying without prejudice #10 Motion to Transfer. Jensen seeks to transfer the case to the New Haven courthouse on the ground that he does not have reliable transportation to or from Bridgeport. There will be very few proceedings, however, in which Jensen will have to appear in person. The motion is therefore denied without prejudice to re-filing once the case is trial-ready. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 4/20/2021. (Simon, K.)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time until May 13, 2021 to Respond to Complaint; granting nunc pro tunc #13 Motion for Extension of Time until May 13, 2021 to Respond to Complaint. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 4/20/2021. (Simon, K.)
April 19, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE by Mark Odyneir re #18 MOTION to Dismiss as Required by Local Rule 12(a) (Shearin, James)
April 19, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss by Mark Odyneir.Responses due by 5/10/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Complaint)(Shearin, James)
April 13, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Evidence by Mathew Jensen. (Freberg, B)
April 13, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE by Michael Asmeram re #15 MOTION to Dismiss to Self-Represented Litigant (Lacombe, Elizabeth)
April 13, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss by Michael Asmeram.Responses due by 5/4/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Certificate of Service)(Lacombe, Elizabeth)
April 13, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth M Lacombe on behalf of Michael Asmeram (Lacombe, Elizabeth)
April 13, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time until May 13, 2021 To Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint #1 Notice of Removal, by Mark Odyneir. (Shearin, James)
April 13, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by James T. Shearin on behalf of Mark Odyneir (Shearin, James)
April 13, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Colleen J. Vellturo on behalf of Rolando Rodriguez (As a correction of Docket No. 8) (Vellturo, Colleen)
April 13, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time until 5/13/2021 to Respond to Complaint by Rolando Rodriguez. (Vellturo, Colleen)
April 13, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Colleen J. Vellturo on behalf of Rolando Rodriguez (Vellturo, Colleen)
April 12, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Chapter 927 / MOTION for Transfer of Location of Court House by Mathew Jensen. (Freberg, B)
April 7, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Marlene Rubin, #5 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Marlene Rubin, #3 MOTION to Substitute Party filed by Marlene Rubin, #6 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 04/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order)(Fazekas, J.)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 04/6/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 04/6/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/5/2021. Discovery due by 10/6/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 11/10/2021. Signed by Clerk on 04/6/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
April 6, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Substitute Party by Marlene Rubin. (Elicker, Natalie)
April 6, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Natalie Nicole Elicker on behalf of Marlene Rubin (Elicker, Natalie) Modified on 4/6/2021 to correct party(Hushin, Z.).
April 6, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Marlene Rubin from Conn. Super. Ct., case number No. NNH-CV21-5050180-S., filed by Marlene Rubin. (Attachments: #1 State Court Summons and Complaint)(Elicker, Natalie) Modified on 4/6/2021 to correct filing party (Hushin, Z.).
April 6, 2021 Judge Stefan R. Underhill added. (Oliver, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jensen v. Rubin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Asmeram
Represented By: Elizabeth M Lacombe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rolando Rodriguez
Represented By: Colleen J. Vellturo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marlene Rubin
Represented By: Natalie Nicole Elicker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Odyneir
Represented By: James T. Shearin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Natalie Nicole Elicker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mathew Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?