Kazmierczak v. National Institute of Standards and Technology et al
Plaintiff: Jacek Kazmierczak
Defendant: Rick Scott, State of Florida, Dick Cheney, Jeb Bush, Central Intelligence Agency, National Institute of Standards and Technology, Federal Aviation Administration, New York Fire Department, Carlyle Group, Donald J. Trump, Shyam Sundar, Bill Posey, AA American Airlines, National Security Agency, New York Port Authority, Pam Bondi, George W. Bush, C.I.A. Bin Laden Station Unit, Halliburton and Saudi Binladin Group
Case Number: 3:2021cv00508
Filed: April 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION. On April 21, 2021, the Court entered an order to show cause why this action should not be dismiss pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B). Doc. #6. Plaintiff has filed a response. Doc. #9. The Court's review of plaintiff's response does not disclose any grounds that overcome the Court's concerns as stated in its order to show cause and to allow the action to proceed. Accordingly, the Court DISMISSES this action. Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED as moot in light of the dismissal of this action. The Clerk of Court shall close this case. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 4/30/2021.(Freberg, B)
April 29, 2021 Filing 9 Letter Re: Complaint from Jacek Kazmierczak (Freberg, B)
April 27, 2021 Filing 8 Docket Entry Correction re #7 Report on Patent/Trademark Form - Attached copy of complaint. Ad hoc: US Patent Office (notice_of_suit@uspto.gov) (Freberg, B)
April 27, 2021 Filing 7 AO 120 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Patent or Trademark Form Completed (Freberg, B) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/27/2021: #1 Complaint) (Freberg, B).
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY COMPLAINT SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED. For the reasons stated in the attached order, it appears that the complaint is subject to dismissal under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B). The Court will allow Kazmierczak an opportunity to file a response by April 30, 2021 to explain why this action should not be dismissed. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 4/21/2021. (DeBot, B.)
April 21, 2021 Set Deadlines: Show Cause Response due by 4/30/2021 (Freberg, B)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 4/13/2021.(Freberg, B)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 4/13/2021.(Freberg, B)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/12/2021; Discovery due by 10/13/2021; Dispositive Motions due by 11/17/2021. Signed by Clerk on 4/13/2021.(Freberg, B)
April 13, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jacek Kazmierczak. (Freberg, B)
April 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AA American Airlines, Pam Bondi, George W. Bush, Jeb Bush, C.I.A. Bin Laden Station Unit, Carlyle Group, Central Intelligence Agency, Dick Cheney, Federal Aviation Administration, State of Florida, Halliburton, National Institute of Standards and Technology, National Security Agency, New York Fire Department, New York Port Authority, Bill Posey, Saudi Binladin Group, Rick Scott, Shyam Sundar, Donald J. Trump, filed by Jacek Kazmierczak. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope)(Freberg, B)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kazmierczak v. National Institute of Standards and Technology et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dick Cheney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeb Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Intelligence Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Institute of Standards and Technology
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Aviation Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York Fire Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlyle Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald J. Trump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shyam Sundar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Posey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AA American Airlines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Security Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York Port Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pam Bondi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George W. Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.I.A. Bin Laden Station Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halliburton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saudi Binladin Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacek Kazmierczak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?