Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company v. Migneault et al
Plaintiff: Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company
Defendant: Imran Iqbal, Jean Claude Migneault as Administrator of the Estate of Elle Migneault, Mohammed Iqbal d/b/a Sam's Food Stores, Jean Claude Migneault and Mohammad Iqbal doing business as Sam's Food Stores
Case Number: 3:2021cv00510
Filed: April 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet Bond Arterton
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint, on consent, to 6/30/21. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 5/17/21. (Tooker, Aimee)
May 18, 2021 Answer deadline updated for All Defendants. (Tooker, Aimee)
May 14, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time until 6/30/2021 by Jean Claude Migneault. (Ouellette, Steven)
May 12, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Darnell Deonas Crosland on behalf of Mohammad Iqbal (Crosland, Darnell)
May 11, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Darnell Deonas Crosland on behalf of Imran Iqbal (Crosland, Darnell)
May 11, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven A. Ouellette on behalf of Jean Claude Migneault (Ouellette, Steven)
May 3, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company re #1 Complaint Marshal's Return (Cannavino, John)
April 15, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company. (Cannavino, John)
April 14, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Imran Iqbal, Mohammad Iqbal, Jean Claude Migneault* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *John Wade Cannavino, Jr.* *Ryan Ryan Deluca, LLP* *707 Summer Street* *Stamford, CT 06901*. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
April 14, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company, #4 Protective Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 4/14/2021.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 3/13/2021.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 4/13/2021.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/12/2021 Discovery due by 10/13/2021 Dispositive Motions due by 11/17/2021 Signed by Clerk on 4/13/2021.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
April 13, 2021 Judge Janet Bond Arterton added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
April 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Imran Iqbal, Mohammed Iqbal, Jean Claude Migneault ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-6469858.), filed by Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company.(Cannavino, John) Modified on 4/14/2021 to edit text (Walker, J.).
April 13, 2021 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Cannavino, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company v. Migneault et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imran Iqbal
Represented By: Darnell Deonas Crosland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean Claude Migneault as Administrator of the Estate of Elle Migneault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohammed Iqbal d/b/a Sam's Food Stores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean Claude Migneault
Represented By: Steven A. Ouellette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohammad Iqbal doing business as Sam's Food Stores
Represented By: Darnell Deonas Crosland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: John Wade Cannavino, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?