Zeitler et al v. Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Steven Washburn and Elaine W. Zeitler
Defendant: Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2021cv00519
Filed: April 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet Bond Arterton
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company, filed by Steven Washburn, Elaine W. Zeitler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Tracked Changes Copy of Amended Complaint)(Sasso, Warren)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until 06/25/2021 to finalize report of the parties' planning meeting and exchange parties' initial disclosures by Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Thompson, Melicent)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Janet Bond Arterton: Pre-Filing Conference held on 5/11/2021 Total Time: 1 hour (Court Reporter Melissa Cianciullo) (Barry, Donna)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER: Pursuant to the colloquy with counsel on the record 5/11/21, the following is ordered: (1) Plaintiff's Amended Complaint will be filed by 6/1/21. (2) Defendant's Motion to Dismiss will be filed by 6/15/21; opposition will be filed by 7/7/21; any reply will be filed by 7/21/21.(Tooker, Aimee)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Warren F. Sasso, Jr on behalf of Steven Washburn, Elaine W. Zeitler (Sasso, Warren)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Pre-Filing Conference. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 4/26/21. (Tooker, Aimee)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order A telephonic pre-filing conference will be held 5/11/21 at 11:00 a.m. as follows: 1-877-402-9753; Access Code 3535720. (Tooker, Aimee)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 First MOTION for Pre-Filing Conference by Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Samuel, Stacey)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying #11 Motion to Dismiss, without prejudice to renew, for failure to comply with the Court's pre-filing conference requirement. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 4/22/21. (Tooker, Aimee)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Memorandum in Support re #11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Samuel, Stacey)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company.Responses due by 5/12/2021 (Samuel, Stacey)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company, #8 Electronic Filing Order, #5 Notice (Other) filed by Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company, #6 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company, #9 Protective Order, #7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Notice (Other) filed by Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company, #3 Notice of Appearance filed by Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company Signed by Clerk on 4/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases)(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 4/15/2021.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 4/15/2021.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/14/2021 Discovery due by 10/15/2021 Dispositive Motions due by 11/19/2021 Signed by Clerk on 4/15/2021.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company for Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Thompson, Melicent)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE by Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company of Statement of Compliance with Standing Order on Removed Cases (Thompson, Melicent)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE by Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company of Pending Motions (Thompson, Melicent)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Stacey Liz Samuel on behalf of Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company (Samuel, Stacey)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Melicent B. Thompson on behalf of Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company (Thompson, Melicent)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company from Superior Court at Torrington, case number LLI-CV-21-6027557-S. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACTDC-6472082, filed by Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Thompson, Melicent)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Judge Janet Bond Arterton added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zeitler et al v. Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Washburn
Represented By: Warren F. Sasso, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elaine W. Zeitler
Represented By: Warren F. Sasso, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Melicent B. Thompson
Represented By: Stacey Liz Samuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?