Aubin v. Walmart, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Tara L. Aubin
Defendant: Wal Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Walmart Claims Services, Inc., Wal-Mart.com USA, LLC, Lisbon Landing Phase II, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Wal-Mart Realty Company, Lisbon Landing, LLC, Walmart, Inc., Wal-Mart TRS, LLC, Wal-Mart Transportation, LLC, Wal-Mart Associates, Inc and WS Asset Management, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00576
Filed: April 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2021 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Oliver, T.)
May 25, 2021 Filing 14 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case by Tara L. Aubin. (Zrenda, Kyle)
April 29, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE by Wal Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Associates, Inc, Wal-Mart Realty Company, Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Wal-Mart TRS, LLC, Wal-Mart Transportation, LLC, Wal-Mart.com USA, LLC, Walmart Claims Services, Inc., Walmart, Inc. Service of Court Orders in Removed Cases (Springer, George)
April 28, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by Walmart, Inc., Wal-Mart Realty Company, Wal Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Wal-Mart Associates, Inc, Wal-Mart.Com USA, LLC, Wal-Mart Transportation, LLC, Wal-Mart.com USA, LLC, Wal-Mart TRS, LLC, Walmart Claims Services, Inc., #2 Notice of Appearance, filed by George C. Springer, Jr on behalf of Walmart, Inc., Wal-Mart Realty Company, Wal Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Wal-Mart Associates, Inc, Wal-Mart.Com USA, LLC, Wal-Mart Transportation, LLC, Wal-Mart.com USA, LLC, Wal-Mart TRS, LLC, Walmart Claims Services, Inc., #5 Statement Regarding Removed Case Per Local Standing Orders, filed by Walmart, Inc., Wal-Mart Realty Company, Wal Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Wal-Mart Associates, Inc, Wal-Mart.Com USA, LLC, Wal-Mart Transportation, LLC, Wal-Mart.com USA, LLC, Wal-Mart TRS, LLC, Walmart Claims Services, Inc., #7 Certificate of Filing Copy of Notice of Removal in State Court, filed by Walmart, Inc., Wal-Mart Realty Company, Wal Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Wal-Mart Associates, Inc, Wal-Mart.Com USA, LLC, Wal-Mart Transportation, LLC, Wal-Mart.com USA, LLC, Wal-Mart TRS, LLC, Walmart Claims Services, Inc., #3 Answer to Complaint, filed by Walmart, Inc., Wal-Mart Realty Company, Wal Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Wal-Mart Associates, Inc, Wal-Mart.Com USA, LLC, Wal-Mart Transportation, LLC, Wal-Mart.com USA, LLC, Wal-Mart TRS, LLC, Walmart Claims Services, Inc., #10 Electronic Filing Order, #6 Corporate Disclosure Statement,,, filed by Walmart, Inc., Wal-Mart Realty Company, Wal Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Wal-Mart Associates, Inc, Wal-Mart.Com USA, LLC, Wal-Mart Transportation, LLC, Wal-Mart.com USA, LLC, Wal-Mart TRS, LLC, Walmart Claims Services, Inc., #9 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #8 Notice of Appearance, filed by Walmart, Inc., Wal-Mart Realty Company, Wal Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Wal-Mart Associates, Inc, Katie Ann Roy on behalf of Wal-Mart.Com USA, LLC, Wal-Mart Transportation, LLC, Wal-Mart.com USA, LLC, Wal-Mart TRS, LLC, Walmart Claims Services, Inc., #11 Standing Protective Order, #4 Notice of Pending Motions, filed by Walmart, Inc., Wal-Mart Realty Company, Wal Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Wal-Mart Associates, Inc, Wal-Mart.Com USA, LLC, Wal-Mart Transportation, LLC, Wal-Mart.com USA, LLC, Wal-Mart TRS, LLC, Walmart Claims Services, Inc. Signed by Clerk on 04/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order)(Fazekas, J.)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 04/27/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 04/27/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/26/2021. Discovery due by 10/27/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 12/1/2021. Signed by Clerk on 04/27/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
April 27, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Katie Ann Roy on behalf of Wal Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Associates, Inc, Wal-Mart Realty Company, Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Wal-Mart TRS, LLC, Wal-Mart Transportation, LLC, Wal-Mart.com USA, LLC, Walmart Claims Services, Inc., Walmart, Inc. (Roy, Katie)
April 27, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE by Wal Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Associates, Inc, Wal-Mart Realty Company, Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Wal-Mart TRS, LLC, Wal-Mart Transportation, LLC, Wal-Mart.com USA, LLC, Walmart Claims Services, Inc., Walmart, Inc. Certificate of Filing Copy of Notice of Removal in State Court (Springer, George)
April 27, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Associates, Inc, Wal-Mart Realty Company, Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Wal-Mart TRS, LLC, Wal-Mart Transportation, LLC, Wal-Mart.com USA, LLC, Walmart Claims Services, Inc., Walmart, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate WSE Investment, LLC, Other Affiliate WSE Management, LLC, Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust for Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership; Corporate Parent Walmart, Inc., Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Transportation, LLC, Other Affiliate Wal-Mart.Com USA, LLC, Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Realty Company, Other Affiliate Walmart Claims Services, Inc., Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Associates, Inc. for Walmart, Inc.; Other Affiliate Wal-Mart TRS, LLC for Wal Mart Real Estate Business Trust. (Springer, George)
April 27, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE by Wal Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Associates, Inc, Wal-Mart Realty Company, Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Wal-Mart TRS, LLC, Wal-Mart Transportation, LLC, Wal-Mart.com USA, LLC, Walmart Claims Services, Inc., Walmart, Inc. Statement Regarding Removed Case Per Local Standing Orders (Springer, George)
April 27, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE by Wal Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Associates, Inc, Wal-Mart Realty Company, Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Wal-Mart TRS, LLC, Wal-Mart Transportation, LLC, Wal-Mart.com USA, LLC, Walmart Claims Services, Inc., Walmart, Inc. Pending Motions (Springer, George)
April 27, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Wal Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Associates, Inc, Wal-Mart Realty Company, Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Wal-Mart TRS, LLC, Wal-Mart Transportation, LLC, Wal-Mart.com USA, LLC, Walmart Claims Services, Inc., Walmart, Inc..(Springer, George)
April 27, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by George C. Springer, Jr on behalf of Wal Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Associates, Inc, Wal-Mart Realty Company, Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Wal-Mart TRS, LLC, Wal-Mart Transportation, LLC, Wal-Mart.com USA, LLC, Walmart Claims Services, Inc., Walmart, Inc. (Springer, George)
April 27, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Walmart Claims Services, Inc., Wal-Mart.com USA, LLC, Wal-Mart TRS, LLC, Walmart, Inc., Wal-Mart Realty Company, Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Transportation, LLC, from New London Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACTDC-6485925, filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Walmart Claims Services, Inc., Wal-Mart.com USA, LLC, Wal-Mart TRS, LLC, Walmart, Inc., Wal-Mart Realty Company, Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Transportation, LLC.(Springer, George) Modified on 4/27/2021 to correct filers(Hushin, Z.).
April 27, 2021 Judge Stefan R. Underhill added. (Oliver, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aubin v. Walmart, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal Mart Real Estate Business Trust
Represented By: Katie Ann Roy
Represented By: George C. Springer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Claims Services, Inc.
Represented By: Katie Ann Roy
Represented By: George C. Springer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart.com USA, LLC
Represented By: Katie Ann Roy
Represented By: George C. Springer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisbon Landing Phase II, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership
Represented By: Katie Ann Roy
Represented By: George C. Springer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Realty Company
Represented By: Katie Ann Roy
Represented By: George C. Springer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisbon Landing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Represented By: Katie Ann Roy
Represented By: George C. Springer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart TRS, LLC
Represented By: Katie Ann Roy
Represented By: George C. Springer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Transportation, LLC
Represented By: Katie Ann Roy
Represented By: George C. Springer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Associates, Inc
Represented By: Katie Ann Roy
Represented By: George C. Springer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WS Asset Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara L. Aubin
Represented By: Kyle Zrenda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?