Andrews v. U.S. Bank National Association
Plaintiff: Thomas Andrews
Defendant: U.S Bank National Association and U.S. Bank National Association
Case Number: 3:2021cv00600
Filed: May 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss by U.S. Bank National Association.Responses due by 7/16/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Higgins, Sean)
June 16, 2021 Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/3/2021 (Johnson, D.)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER. The Court construes the #14 motion for a toll of time as a motion for extension and hereby DENIES the #14 motion for extension for a failure to identify a specific deadline that plaintiff seeks to extend. The Court notes that the parties' Local Rule 26(f) report is due on July 3, 2021. Should any party wish to extend that deadline, they may file a motion for extension for good cause and in compliance with the requirements of Local Rule 7(b).Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 6/16/2021. (Super, John)
June 4, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time until 60 days by Thomas Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Peterson, M)
May 25, 2021 Answer deadline updated for U.S. Bank National Association to 6/29/2021. (Johnson, D.)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER. The #12 motion for extension is hereby GRANTED. Defendant's responsive pleading is due by June 29, 2021. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 5/25/2021. (Super, John)
May 21, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time until June 29, 2021 To Respond to Complaint #1 Complaint by U.S. Bank National Association. (Higgins, Sean)
May 20, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean R. Higgins on behalf of U.S. Bank National Association (Higgins, Sean)
May 10, 2021 Filing 10 USM 285 forms together with Summons/Notice of Lawsuit/Request for Waiver of Service of Summons and all instructions mailed to IFP plaintiff to complete and return to Clerk's office. (Agati, Kathryn)
May 10, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Thomas Andrews, #5 Standing Protective Order, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, 7 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #1 Complaint filed by Thomas Andrews. Signed by Clerk on 5/10/2021. (Agati, Kathryn)
May 10, 2021 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *U.S. Bank National Association* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. *Thomas Andrews* *187 North Moodus Road* *Moodus, CT 06459*. (Agati, Kathryn)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. The #2 motion to proceed in forma pauperis is hereby GRANTED.Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 5/7/2021. (Super, John)
May 3, 2021 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to U.S. Bank National Association. (Reis, Julia) Modified file date on 5/4/2021 (Reis, Julia).
May 3, 2021 Filing 6 ENTERED IN ERROR: ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *U.S Bank National Association* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. *Thomas Andrews* *187 North Moodus Road* *Moodus, CT 06459*. (Reis, Julia) Modified on 5/4/2021, summons issued prematurely (Reis, Julia).
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 5/3/2021. (Reis, Julia)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 5/3/2021. (Reis, Julia)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/2/2021. Discovery due by 11/2/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 12/7/2021. Signed by Clerk on 5/3/2021. (Reis, Julia)
May 3, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Thomas Andrews. (Reis, Julia)
May 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U.S Bank National Association, filed by Thomas Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Request to Issue Summons, #4 Envelope)(Reis, Julia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andrews v. U.S. Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Sean R. Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?