Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company v. Burns et al
Plaintiff: Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company
Defendant: Joseph Grenier and Keith Burns
Case Number: 3:2021cv00676
Filed: May 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company.Responses due by 8/2/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Petter, Kelly)
June 15, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael L. Anderson on behalf of Joseph Grenier (Anderson, Michael)
June 15, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company. Keith Burns served on 6/9/2021, answer due 6/30/2021; Joseph Grenier served on 6/9/2021, answer due 6/30/2021. (Petter, Kelly)
May 17, 2021 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Keith Burns, Joseph Grenier* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Kelly E. Petter* *Hassett and Donnelly, P.C.* *185 Asylum Street, 26th Floor* *Hartford, CT 06103*. (Freberg, B)
May 17, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Electronic Filing Order, #5 Protective Order, #1 Complaint, filed by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company Signed by Clerk on 5/17/2021.(Freberg, B)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 5/14/2021.(Freberg, B)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 5/14/2021.(Freberg, B)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/13/2021 Discovery due by 11/13/2021 Dispositive Motions due by 12/18/2021 Signed by Clerk on 5/14/2021.(Freberg, B)
May 14, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly E. Petter on behalf of Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company (Petter, Kelly)
May 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-6509629.), filed by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1_Certified Policy, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2_Underlying Complaint)(Petter, Kelly)
May 14, 2021 Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer added. (Oliver, T.)
May 14, 2021 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Petter, Kelly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company v. Burns et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company
Represented By: Kelly E. Petter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Grenier
Represented By: Michael L. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?