L. Suzio Concrete Company v. Regent Insurance Company
Plaintiff: L. Suzio Concrete Company and L. Suzio Concrete Company Inc.
Defendant: Regent Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2021cv00677
Filed: May 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Alfred V Covello
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2021 Filing 16 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Vita, Jeffrey)
July 6, 2021 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Regent Insurance Company, filed by L. Suzio Concrete Company.(Alexander, R.)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 motion for leave to file; finding as moot #11 motion to dismiss. The clerk is hereby directed to docket the amended complaint attached to the plaintiff's motion #12 . Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 07/01/21. (Covello, Alfred)
June 25, 2021 Filing 13 Memorandum in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by L. Suzio Concrete Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Plaintiff's Response/Objection to Defendant's I&RP to)(Vita, Jeffrey)
June 25, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by L. Suzio Concrete Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Redlined Proposed Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B Proposed Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit C Michael Lettiero written consent to amend complaint)(Vita, Jeffrey)
May 21, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by Regent Insurance Company.Responses due by 6/11/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13)(Lettiero, Michael)
May 17, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey J. Vita on behalf of L. Suzio Concrete Company (Vita, Jeffrey)
May 17, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO THE BAR OF THE US DISTRICT COURT OF CONNECTICUT Re: Local Rule 83.1 Admission of Attorneys. The above captioned case has been received and filed in our court. Please see our Local Rule 83.1 regarding Admission of Attorneys that is available on our website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. You will not be added to the case, nor will we accept further filings until you have complied with Local Rule 83.1. If you have any questions about this procedure, please contact the Clerk's Office. Signed by Clerk on 5/17/2021.(Bozek, M.)
May 17, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #7 Electronic Filing Order, #3 Notice (Other) filed by Regent Insurance Company, #4 Notice (Other) filed by Regent Insurance Company, #5 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Regent Insurance Company, #2 Notice (Other) filed by Regent Insurance Company, #6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, and #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Regent Insurance Company. Signed by Clerk on 5/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases)(Bozek, M.)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 5/14/2021.(Bozek, M.)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/13/2021. Discovery due by 11/13/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 12/18/2021. Signed by Clerk on 5/14/2021.(Bozek, M.)
May 14, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Regent Insurance Company. (Lettiero, Michael)
May 14, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE by Regent Insurance Company Statement in Compliance with Standing Order for Removed Cases (Lettiero, Michael)
May 14, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE by Regent Insurance Company To Counsel Re Local Rule 5(b) (Lettiero, Michael)
May 14, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE by Regent Insurance Company Of Pending Motions (Lettiero, Michael)
May 14, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Regent Insurance Company from Superior Court of Hartford, case number HHD-CV21-6140954-S. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACTDC-6509789, filed by Regent Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Lettiero, Michael)
May 14, 2021 Judge Alfred V. Covello added. (Oliver, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: L. Suzio Concrete Company v. Regent Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regent Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael F Lettiero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L. Suzio Concrete Company
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Vita
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L. Suzio Concrete Company Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Vita
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?