Jusino v. Gallagher et al
Plaintiff: Jose A. Jusino
Defendant: Walker, Colleen Gallagher, Furtick, Ellison, Henderson, Ross Walker, Kristine Barone, Doran, Ogando and Maldonado
Case Number: 3:2021cv00689
Filed: May 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2021 Filing 8 Judicial Act/Notice by Jose A. Jusino (Oliver, T.)
June 14, 2021 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ellison, Furtick, Colleen Gallagher, Henderson, Ross Walker, Kristine Barone, Doran, Ogando, Maldonado, filed by Jose A. Jusino. (Oliver, T.)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Jusino's motion to amend his complaint. "A party may amend its pleading once as a matter of course within... 21 days after serving it, or... if the pleading is one to which a responsive pleading is required, 21 days after service of a responsive pleading or 21 days after service of" a Rule 12 motion, "whichever is earlier." Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1). "In all other cases, a party may amend its pleading only with the opposing party's written consent or the court's leave. The court should freely give leave when justice so requires." Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(2). Although Jusino has not yet served his complaint, he need not because it is awaiting my initial review. See 28 U.S.C. 1915A. I grant Jusino leave to file his amended complaint, which is attached to his motion as doc. no. [5-1]. The Clerk is instructed to docket Jusino's amended complaint (doc. no. [5-1]) as the operative complaint in this action. I will conduct an initial review of Jusino's amended complaint.Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 06/14/2021. (Rosenberg, J.)
June 11, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by Jose A. Jusino. Responses due by 7/2/2021 (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint) (Oliver, T.)
May 19, 2021 Filing fee received from Jose Jusino: $402.00, receipt number CTXB00012133. (Fazekas, J.)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER ON PRISONER ELECTRONIC FILING PROGRAM Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 05/19/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 05/19/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 05/19/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
May 19, 2021 Filing 1 PRISCS - COMPLAINT against Ellison, Furtick, Colleen Gallagher, Henderson, Walker, filed by Jose A. Jusino. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Fazekas, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jusino v. Gallagher et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose A. Jusino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colleen Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Furtick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ross Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristine Barone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ogando
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maldonado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?