Paschal-Barros v. Mental Health & Addiction Svcs et al
Plaintiff: Kyle Lamar Paschal-Barros and Deja L. Paschal
Defendant: Dept of Mental Health & Addiction Svcs, Commissioner, Department of Correction and Commissioner of Mental Health and Addiction Services
Case Number: 3:2021cv00700
Filed: May 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L Bryant
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying as moot #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying as moot #10 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Granting #14 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Farrish on 7/16/21. If you change your address at any time during the litigation of this case, Local Rule 83.1(c)2 provides that you notify the court. Failure to do so can result in the dismissal of your case. (Payton, R.).
July 13, 2021 Filing 15 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Kyle Lamar Paschal-Barros. (Payton, R.)
July 13, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kyle Lamar Paschal-Barros. (Payton, R.)
July 13, 2021 Filing 13 OBJECTION re 12 Order re: Insufficiency, filed by Kyle Lamar Paschal-Barros. (Payton, R.)
June 24, 2021 Filing 12 Notice to petitioner re: Insufficiency #11 Ledger Sheet. You must submit a ledger sheet showing the past six months transactions (deposits and withdrawals) If insufficiency not corrected Dismissal due by 7/14/2021 Signed by Judge Thomas O. Farrish on 6/24/21.(Payton, R.)
June 24, 2021 Filing 11 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Kyle Lamar Paschal-Barros. (Payton, R.)
June 24, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kyle Lamar Paschal-Barros. (Payton, R.)
June 10, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Adddress by Kyle Lamar Paschal-Barros. (Fazekas, J.)
May 28, 2021 Filing 8 Notice to petitioner re: Insufficiency #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. You must submit the attached Prisoner's IFP motion sent to you via U.S.Mail. If insufficiency not corrected Dismissal due by 6/18/2021 Signed by Judge Thomas O. Farrish on 5/28/21.(Payton, R.)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER ON PRISONER ELECTRONIC FILING PROGRAM Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 05/24/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 05/24/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 05/24/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
May 24, 2021 Filing 4 PRISCS - MOTION for Order by Kyle Lamar Paschal-Barros. (Fazekas, J.) Modified on 5/24/2021 to add prefix(Fazekas, J.).
May 24, 2021 Filing 3 PRISCS - Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Kyle Lamar Paschal-Barros. (Fazekas, J.)
May 24, 2021 Filing 2 PRISCS - MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kyle Lamar Paschal-Barros. (Fazekas, J.)
May 24, 2021 Filing 1 PRISCS - COMPLAINT against Commissioner, Department of Correction, Dept of Mental Health & Addiction Svcs, filed by Kyle Lamar Paschal-Barros.(Fazekas, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paschal-Barros v. Mental Health & Addiction Svcs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dept of Mental Health & Addiction Svcs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Correction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Mental Health and Addiction Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Lamar Paschal-Barros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deja L. Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?