Comforti et al v. Air & Liquid Systems Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Phyllis Comforti and Angelo Comforti
Defendant: Foster Wheeler, LLC, Elliott Company, General Electric Company, CBS Corp, Crane Co. and Air & Liquid Systems Corp
Case Number: 3:2021cv00708
Filed: May 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE of Joinder re. #1 Notice of Removal filed by CBS Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Barry, Donna)
June 9, 2021 Filing 26 ANSWER to Complaint with Special Defenses with Jury Demand by CBS Corp.(Martin, Robert)
June 9, 2021 Filing 25 ENTERED IN ERROR - MOTION for Joinder re #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by Crane Co. by CBS Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Martin, Robert) Modified text on 6/12/2021 and terminated motion (Barry, Donna).
June 9, 2021 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CBS Corp identifying Corporate Parent National Amusements, Inc. for CBS Corp. (Martin, Robert)
June 9, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert F. Martin on behalf of CBS Corp (Martin, Robert)
June 4, 2021 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Elliott Company. (D'Agostino, Michael)
June 4, 2021 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Elliott Company.(D'Agostino, Michael)
June 4, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Wayne E. George on behalf of Elliott Company (George, Wayne)
June 4, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael C. D'Agostino on behalf of Elliott Company (D'Agostino, Michael)
June 1, 2021 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Crane Co..(Lyons, Thomas)
May 28, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE by General Electric Company Joinder in Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mohan, Catherine)
May 28, 2021 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by General Electric Company.(Mohan, Catherine)
May 28, 2021 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Electric Company. (Mohan, Catherine)
May 28, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine A. Mohan on behalf of General Electric Company (Mohan, Catherine)
May 27, 2021 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Air & Liquid Systems Corp identifying Corporate Parent Ampco-Pittsburgh Corporation for Air & Liquid Systems Corp. (Felice, John)
May 27, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE by Air & Liquid Systems Corp of Joinder in Removal (Felice, John)
May 27, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses , First CROSSCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Air & Liquid Systems Corp.(Felice, John)
May 27, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by John R Felice on behalf of Air & Liquid Systems Corp (Felice, John)
May 27, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian M. Gibbons on behalf of Air & Liquid Systems Corp (Gibbons, Brian)
May 26, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #7 Protective Order, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Crane Co., #6 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Notice (Other) filed by Crane Co., #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by Crane Co., #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Crane Co. Signed by Clerk on 5/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removals)(Freberg, B)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 5/25/2021.(Freberg, B)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 5/25/2021.(Freberg, B)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/24/2021; Discovery due by 11/24/2021; Dispositive Motions due by 12/29/2021. Signed by Clerk on 5/25/2021.(Freberg, B)
May 25, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE by Crane Co. re #1 Notice of Removal,, Notice of Pending Motions (Lyons, Thomas)
May 25, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crane Co.. (Lyons, Thomas)
May 25, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas N. Lyons on behalf of Crane Co. (Lyons, Thomas)
May 25, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Crane Co. from Bridgeport Superior Court, case number FBT-CV-21-6106133-S. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACTDC-6520790, filed by Crane Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3 (1 of 6), #4 Exhibit 3 (2 of 6), #5 Exhibit 3 (3 of 6), #6 Exhibit 3 (4 of 6), #7 Exhibit 3 (5 of 6), #8 Exhibit 3 (6 of 6), #9 Exhibit 4 (1 of 5), #10 Exhibit 4 (2 of 5), #11 Exhibit 4 (3 of 5), #12 Exhibit 4 (4 of 5), #13 Exhibit 4 (5 of 5), #14 Errata 5)(Lyons, Thomas)
May 25, 2021 Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer added. (Oliver, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Comforti et al v. Air & Liquid Systems Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phyllis Comforti
Represented By: Christopher Meisenkothen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelo Comforti
Represented By: Christopher Meisenkothen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliott Company
Represented By: Michael C. D'Agostino
Represented By: Wayne E. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Catherine A. Mohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corp
Represented By: Robert F. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Thomas N. Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corp
Represented By: John R Felice
Represented By: Brian M. Gibbons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?