Cruz v. Cook Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Cruz
Defendant: Cook Group, Inc., Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical LLC and Cook Medical Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2021cv00769
Filed: June 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2021 Acknowledgment of Receipt re: Case Transferred Out CASE: 3:21-cv-00769. DETAILS: Case transferred from Connecticut has been opened in Southern District of Indiana as case 1:21-cv-06505, filed 07/15/2021.(Walker, J.)
July 15, 2021 Filing 14 MDL Transfer Order. Case Transferred to the Southern District of Indiana. Signed by Clerk on 0715/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
July 15, 2021 Case electronically transferred to the Southern District of Indiana pursuant to MDL transfer order (MDL 2570). (Walker, J.)
June 24, 2021 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jacqueline Cruz re #1 Complaint Cook Incorporated (Moskow, Neal)
June 24, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jacqueline Cruz re #1 Complaint Cook Medical Incorporated (Moskow, Neal)
June 24, 2021 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jacqueline Cruz re #1 Complaint Cook Medical LLC (Moskow, Neal)
June 24, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jacqueline Cruz re #1 Complaint Cook Group Incorporated (Moskow, Neal)
June 4, 2021 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Cook Medical LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Neal Lewis Moskow* *Ury & Moskow* *883 Black Rock Turnpike* *Fairfield, CT 06825*. (Fazekas, J.)
June 4, 2021 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Cook Medical Incorporated* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Neal Lewis Moskow* *Ury & Moskow* *883 Black Rock Turnpike* *Fairfield, CT 06825*. (Fazekas, J.)
June 4, 2021 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Cook Incorporated* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Neal Lewis Moskow* *Ury & Moskow* *883 Black Rock Turnpike* *Fairfield, CT 06825*. (Fazekas, J.)
June 4, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Cook Group, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Neal Lewis Moskow* *Ury & Moskow* *883 Black Rock Turnpike* *Fairfield, CT 06825*. (Fazekas, J.)
June 4, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Standing Protective Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint filed by Jacqueline Cruz Signed by Clerk on 06/4/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 06/4/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 06/4/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/3/2021. Discovery due by 12/4/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 1/8/2022. Signed by Clerk on 06/4/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
June 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-6533419.), filed by Jacqueline Cruz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Moskow, Neal)
June 4, 2021 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Cook Incorporated. (Moskow, Neal)
June 4, 2021 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Cook Medical Incorporated. (Moskow, Neal)
June 4, 2021 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Cook Medical LLC. (Moskow, Neal)
June 4, 2021 Judge Victor A. Bolden added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
June 4, 2021 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Cook Group, Inc.. (Moskow, Neal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cruz v. Cook Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Medical LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Medical Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Cruz
Represented By: Neal Lewis Moskow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?