Suleymanov v. Winston Premier Logistics, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Abdulfotikh Suleymanov
Defendant: Otabek Umarov and Winston Premier Logistics, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00810
Filed: June 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 206
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2021 Filing 9 USM 285 forms together with Notice of Lawsuit/Request for Waiver of Service of Summons and all instructions mailed to IFP plaintiff to complete and return to Clerk's office. Note: summons requested to issue on 6/15, however, since IFP granted, first service attempt must be made with waivers. (Pesta, J.)
June 18, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Electronic Filing Order, 7 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint filed by Abdulfotikh Suleymanov, #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Abdulfotikh Suleymanov, #5 Protective Order, #6 Order Signed by Clerk on 6/18/21.(Pesta, J.)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 6/18/21. (Barry, Donna)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER FOR FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT CASES NOT PLEADED AS COLLECTIVE ACTIONS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 6/15/2021.(Freberg, B)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 6/15/2021.(Freberg, B)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 6/15/2021.(Freberg, B)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/14/2021; Discovery due by 12/15/2021; Dispositive Motions due by 1/19/2022. Signed by Clerk on 6/15/2021.(Freberg, B)
June 15, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Abdulfotikh Suleymanov. (Freberg, B)
June 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Otabek Umarov, Winston Premier Logistics, LLC, filed by Abdulfotikh Suleymanov.(Freberg, B)
June 15, 2021 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Otabek Umarov, Winston Premier Logistics, LLC. (Freberg, B)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Suleymanov v. Winston Premier Logistics, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Otabek Umarov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winston Premier Logistics, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abdulfotikh Suleymanov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?