Escalera v. Power BDC, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Elena Escalera
Defendant: William Sinko, Jr. and Power BDC, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00818
Filed: June 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Alvin W Thompson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 206
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by Power BDC, LLC, William Sinko, Jr.Responses due by 8/19/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Appendix Unreported Cases)(Garcia Quintner, Maria)
July 20, 2021 Answer deadline updated for Power BDC, LLC to 8/2/2021; William Sinko, Jr to 8/2/2021. (Ferguson, L.)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading (ECF No. #9 ) is hereby GRANTED to August 2, 2021. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 7/20/2021. (Feng, M.)
July 19, 2021 Filing 9 First MOTION for Extension of Time until August 2, 2021 Filing Response to Complaint by Power BDC, LLC, William Sinko, Jr. (Garcia Quintner, Maria)
July 19, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria Eugenia Garcia Quintner on behalf of Power BDC, LLC, William Sinko, Jr (Garcia Quintner, Maria)
June 16, 2021 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Power BDC, LLC, William Sinko, Jr* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Michael John Reilly* *Cicchiello & Cicchiello, LLP* *364 Franklin Avenue* *Hartford, CT 06114*. (Agati, Kathryn)
June 16, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Elena Escalera, #4 Standing Protective Order, #5 Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order. Signed by Clerk on 6/16/2021. (Agati, Kathryn)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Standing Order For Fair Labor Standards Act Cases Not Pleaded as Collective Actions. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 6/16/2021. (Agati, Kathryn)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 6/16/2021. (Agati, Kathryn)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 6/16/2021. (Agati, Kathryn)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/15/2021, Discovery due by 12/16/2021, Dispositive Motions due by 1/20/2022. Signed by Clerk on 6/16/2021. (Agati, Kathryn)
June 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Power BDC, LLC, William Sinko, Jr. ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-6547137.), filed by Elena Escalera.(Reilly, Michael) Modified on 6/16/2021 to update party (Anastasio, F.).
June 16, 2021 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Power BDC, LLC, William Sinko, Jr.. (Reilly, Michael) Modified on 6/16/2021 to update party (Anastasio, F.).
June 16, 2021 Judge Alvin W. Thompson added. (Oliver, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Escalera v. Power BDC, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Sinko, Jr.
Represented By: Maria Eugenia Garcia Quintner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Power BDC, LLC
Represented By: Maria Eugenia Garcia Quintner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elena Escalera
Represented By: Michael John Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?