Providence Mutual Fire Ins Co v. Laires
Plaintiff: Providence Mutual Fire Ins Co
Defendant: Antonio Laires
Case Number: 3:2021cv00844
Filed: June 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Alfred V Covello
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Default Entry 55(a) as to Antonio Laires. Motion for default judgment due by 9/19/2021. A Motion for Default Judgment pursuant to FRCP 55(b) shall be filed or this action will be dismissed by the Clerk pursuant to FRCP 41(a). Signed by Clerk on 8/20/2021. (Bozek, M.)
August 18, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Default Entry 55(a) as to Antonio Laires by Providence Mutual Fire Ins Co. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Racicot, Tara)
July 2, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Providence Mutual Fire Ins Co. Antonio Laires served on 6/26/2021, answer due 7/17/2021. (Racicot, Tara)
June 23, 2021 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Antonio Laires* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Tara Frances Racicot* *Conway Stoughton LLC* *641 Farmington Avenue* *Hartford, CT 06105*. (Bozek, M.)
June 23, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Providence Mutual Fire Ins Co, #4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #5 Electronic Filing Order, #3 Notice of Appearance filed by Providence Mutual Fire Ins Co, and #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Providence Mutual Fire Ins Co. Signed by Clerk on 6/23/2021.(Bozek, M.)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 6/22/2021.(Bozek, M.)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/21/2021. Discovery due by 12/22/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 1/26/2022. Signed by Clerk on 6/22/2021.(Bozek, M.)
June 22, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Tara Frances Racicot on behalf of Providence Mutual Fire Ins Co (Racicot, Tara)
June 22, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Providence Mutual Fire Ins Co. (Racicot, Tara) Modified on 6/22/2021 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).
June 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Antonio Laires ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-6552282.), filed by Providence Mutual Fire Ins Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Racicot, Tara) Modified on 6/22/2021 to correct party(Hushin, Z.).
June 22, 2021 Judge Alfred V. Covello added. (Oliver, T.)
June 22, 2021 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Antonio Laires. (Racicot, Tara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Providence Mutual Fire Ins Co v. Laires
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Providence Mutual Fire Ins Co
Represented By: Tara Frances Racicot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonio Laires
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?