Gutierrez et al v. Los Mariachis, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Arturo Lara Munoz, Madelyn Ramon, Livia Gutierrez, Gladys Selene Ramon and Sandra Gutierrez
Defendant: Food Trucks, LLC, Loren Aguirre, Los Mariachis, LLC and Joseph Flamini
Case Number: 3:2021cv00855
Filed: June 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2021 Filing 22 Consent NOTICE by Livia Gutierrez to be a Party Plaintiff (Steigman, Todd)
August 2, 2021 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #15 MOTION for Attorney(s) Laura Rodriguez to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6579116) by Livia Gutierrez, Sandra Gutierrez, Arturo Lara Munoz, Gladys Selene Ramon, Madelyn Ramon. (Rodriguez, Laura)
August 2, 2021 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #14 MOTION for Attorney(s) Louis Pechman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number BCTDC-6579098) by Livia Gutierrez, Sandra Gutierrez, Arturo Lara Munoz, Gladys Selene Ramon, Madelyn Ramon. (Pechman, Louis)
July 28, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Louis Pechman on behalf of Livia Gutierrez, Sandra Gutierrez, Arturo Lara Munoz, Gladys Selene Ramon, Madelyn Ramon (Pechman, Louis)
July 28, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Rodriguez on behalf of Livia Gutierrez, Sandra Gutierrez, Arturo Lara Munoz, Gladys Selene Ramon, Madelyn Ramon (Rodriguez, Laura)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Louis Pechman ; granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Laura Rodriguez. Certificate of Good Standing due by 9/14/2021. Signed by Clerk on 7/16/2021. (Fanelle, N.)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting on consent #13 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 7/15/2021. (Cahill, Leslie)
July 15, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Attorney(s) Laura Rodriguez to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6579116) by Livia Gutierrez, Sandra Gutierrez, Arturo Lara Munoz, Gladys Selene Ramon, Madelyn Ramon. (Steigman, Todd)
July 15, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Attorney(s) Louis Pechman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number BCTDC-6579098) by Livia Gutierrez, Sandra Gutierrez, Arturo Lara Munoz, Gladys Selene Ramon, Madelyn Ramon. (Steigman, Todd)
July 15, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time until September 13, 2021 To Plead by Loren Aguirre, Joseph Flamini, Food Trucks, LLC, Los Mariachis, LLC. (Tagatac, Paul)
July 15, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul S. Tagatac on behalf of Loren Aguirre, Joseph Flamini, Food Trucks, LLC, Los Mariachis, LLC (Tagatac, Paul)
July 8, 2021 Filing 11 Consent NOTICE by Arturo Lara Munoz to be a Party Plaintiff (Steigman, Todd)
July 8, 2021 Filing 10 Consent NOTICE by Gladys Selene Ramon to be a Party Plaintiff (Steigman, Todd)
July 8, 2021 Filing 9 Consent NOTICE by Madelyn Ramon to be a Party Plaintiff (Steigman, Todd)
July 8, 2021 Filing 8 Consent NOTICE by Sandra Gutierrez to be a Party Plaintiff (Steigman, Todd)
June 29, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Madelyn Ramon, Gladys Selene Ramon, Sandra Gutierrez, Arturo Lara Munoz, Livia Gutierrez. Loren Aguirre served on 6/24/2021, answer due 7/15/2021; Joseph Flamini served on 6/24/2021, answer due 7/15/2021; Food Trucks, LLC served on 6/24/2021, answer due 7/15/2021; Los Mariachis, LLC served on 6/24/2021, answer due 7/15/2021. (Steigman, Todd)
June 23, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Loren Aguirre, Joseph Flamini, Food Trucks, LLC, Los Mariachis, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Todd D. Steigman* *Madsen, Prestley & Parenteau, LLC-HTFD* *402 Asylum Street* *Hartford, CT 06103*. (Fazekas, J.)
June 23, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint, filed by Madelyn Ramon, Livia Gutierrez, Gladys Selene Ramon, Sandra Gutierrez, Arturo Lara Munoz, #4 Standing Protective Order, #3 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 06/23/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 06/23/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 06/23/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/22/2021. Discovery due by 12/23/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 1/27/2022. Signed by Clerk on 06/23/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
June 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Loren Aguirre, Joseph Flamini, Food Trucks, LLC, Los Mariachis, LLC ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-6554002.), filed by Madelyn Ramon, Gladys Selene Ramon, Sandra Gutierrez, Arturo Lara Munoz, Livia Gutierrez.(Steigman, Todd)
June 23, 2021 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Loren Aguirre, Joseph Flamini, Food Trucks, LLC, Los Mariachis, LLC. (Steigman, Todd)
June 23, 2021 Judge Kari A. Dooley added. (Anastasio, F.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gutierrez et al v. Los Mariachis, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Food Trucks, LLC
Represented By: Paul S. Tagatac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loren Aguirre
Represented By: Paul S. Tagatac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Los Mariachis, LLC
Represented By: Paul S. Tagatac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Flamini
Represented By: Paul S. Tagatac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arturo Lara Munoz
Represented By: Todd D. Steigman
Represented By: Laura Rodriguez
Represented By: Louis Pechman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Madelyn Ramon
Represented By: Todd D. Steigman
Represented By: Laura Rodriguez
Represented By: Louis Pechman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Livia Gutierrez
Represented By: Todd D. Steigman
Represented By: Laura Rodriguez
Represented By: Louis Pechman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gladys Selene Ramon
Represented By: Todd D. Steigman
Represented By: Laura Rodriguez
Represented By: Louis Pechman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Gutierrez
Represented By: Todd D. Steigman
Represented By: Laura Rodriguez
Represented By: Louis Pechman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?