Chance v. Home Depot USA Inc
Plaintiff: Chance Roderick and Roderick Chance
Defendant: Home Depot USA Inc
Case Number: 3:2021cv00875
Filed: June 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet Bond Arterton
Referring Judge: Omar A Williams
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER. In lieu of the upcoming telephonic status conference, the parties shall file a joint status report on or before July 14, 2022. The status conference scheduled for July 14, 2022 hereby is CANCELLED. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 6/30/2022. (Mamillapalli, S.).
June 30, 2022 Set Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/14/2022. (Mamillapalli, S.).
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #28 motion to withdraw. The court hereby grants Attorney Lapish's motion to withdraw as counsel for Defendant. See ECF No. #28 . Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 5/18/2022. (Mamillapalli, S.).
May 12, 2022 Filing 28 MOTION for Caroline B. Lapish to Withdraw as Attorney by Home Depot USA Inc. (Smith, Kaitlin)
April 25, 2022 Filing 27 Defendant Home Depot has filed a "Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance," which seeks to withdraw the appearance of Attorney Lapish. Under the local rules, "[w]ithdrawals of appearances may be accomplished only upon motion[.]" D. Conn. L. Civ. R. 7(e). Moreover, the motion must indicate that "that the party has received actual notice of the motion to withdraw." Id. In the absence of a motion which indicates actual notice to the client, the court will not withdraw the appearance of Attorney Lapish. Signed by Omar A. Williams on 4/25/2022. (Mamillapalli, S.).
April 18, 2022 Filing 26 Joint STATUS REPORT by Roderick Chance. (Walsh, Patrick)
April 18, 2022 Filing 25 NOTICE by Home Depot USA Inc of Withdrawal of Caroline B. Lapish (Lapish, Caroline) Modified on 4/21/2022 (Velez, F.) to correct motion relief.
April 18, 2022 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Kaitlin Kelly Smith on behalf of Home Depot USA Inc (Smith, Kaitlin)
March 14, 2022 Filing 23 Joint STATUS REPORT by Roderick Chance. (Walsh, Patrick)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER. The telephonic status conference scheduled for 4/18/2022 at 11:00am is hereby CANCELLED, and the parties are instructed to file a joint status report on April 18, 2022. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 3/14/2022. (Mamillapalli, S.).
February 8, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. RESCHEDULED FROM 7/14/2022 3:00 PM. Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/18/2022 11:00 AM before Judge Omar A. Williams. Parties are instructed to call 877-411-9748; Access Code 2605796#. (Mamillapalli, S.).
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER denying #16 MOTION for Sanctions. Defendant seeks sanctions for Plaintiff's failure to serve his initial disclosures by the discovery deadline indicated in this court's order on pretrial deadlines. See #4 . Pursuant to that order, discovery was due 12/25/2021. The parties have since filed a 26(f) Report, with a discovery deadline of 8/15/2022. The court adopted the parties' 26(f) Report when setting the scheduling order. See 18. Plaintiff has since filed his initial disclosures on the court docket ( #20 ), well in advance of the court's discovery deadline. Accordingly, the motion to dismiss is DENIED. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(A), initial disclosures must be provided to the parties, not the court. Plaintiff's counsel is reminded of the rule to not file ANY discovery materials on the court's docket unless instructed to by the court, or unless such material accompanies a dispositive motion. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 2/8/2022.
January 31, 2022 Filing 20 Statement of Material Facts re #16 MOTION for Sanctions Plaintiff's Rule 26(a)(1)(A) Initial Disclosures filed by Roderick Chance, Chance Roderick. (Walsh, Patrick)
January 18, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic status conference set for 7/14/2022 03:00 PM before Judge Omar A. Williams. Parties are instructed to call 877-411-9748; Access Code 2605796# (Mamillapalli, S.).
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 GENERAL SCHEDULING ORDER. The parties' Rule 26(f) Planning Report ( #15 ) is hereby APPROVED as modified by this order. All discovery shall be completed by August 15, 2022, and all other interim discovery dates set forth in the parties' Rule 26(f) Report are hereby adopted. Any dispositive motions shall be filed by September 15, 2022, and any response to dispositive motions shall be filed within 30 days after such dispositive motion. The parties' joint trial memorandum is due by November 15, 2022, or within 30 days of the court's ruling on dispositive motions, whichever date is later. The case shall be trial ready by October 30, 2022. The parties are encouraged to commence discovery forthwith and to arrange their schedules in contemplation of the briefing deadlines for any dispositive motions, because the court is unlikely to grant a future request for an extension of the scheduling order absent extraordinary and unforeseeable circumstances. A telephonic status conference will be held on July 14, 2022 at 3:00pm. Parties are instructed to call 877-411-9748; Access Code 2605796#. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 1/18/2022. (Mamillapalli, S.).
January 17, 2022 Filing 17 Memorandum in Support re #16 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Home Depot USA Inc. (Lapish, Caroline)
January 17, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION for Sanctions by Home Depot USA Inc.Responses due by 2/7/2022 (Lapish, Caroline)
January 17, 2022 Filing 15 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Lapish, Caroline)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 26(f) NOTICE. Defendant removed this action on June 25, 2021. See #1 . The Rule 26(f) Report of the Parties' Planning Meeting was due to be filed on or before August 8, 2021, that is, 44 days after defendant's appearance. See D. Conn. L. Civ. R. 26(f)(1) ("Within thirty days after the first appearance of a defendant, the attorneys of record... who have appeared in the case shall confer for the purposes described in Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f). The conference ordinarily shall be initiated by the plaintiff, and may be conducted by telephone or electronic audio or video conferencing service. Within fourteen (14) days after the conference, the participants shall jointly complete and file a report in the form prescribed by Form 26(f), which appears in the Appendix to these Rules.").To date, the parties have not filed the Rule 26(f) Report. Accordingly, on or before January 17, 2021, the parties shall confer and file the Rule 26(f) Report in compliance with the Local and Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 01/03/2022. (Mamillapalli, S.).
January 3, 2022 Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/17/2022. (Mamillapalli, S).
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Omar A. Williams for all further proceedings. Signed by Clerk on 12/13/2021.(Walker, J.)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Stipulation #11 is So Ordered. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 9/24/21.(Tooker, Aimee)
September 21, 2021 Filing 11 First STIPULATION Joint Motion to Enter Confidentiality Stipulation & Protective Order by Roderick Chance. (Attachments: #1 Confidentiality Stipulation & Protective Order)(Walsh, Patrick)
July 30, 2021 Filing 10 RESPONSE Reply to Special Defenses filed by Roderick Chance. (Walsh, Patrick)
June 30, 2021 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Home Depot USA Inc.(Lapish, Caroline)
June 28, 2021 Filing 8 Docket Modified Correction re #7 Electronic Service Documents, to add attachment #1. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases) (Gutierrez, Y.)
June 28, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #2 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) filed by Home Depot USA Inc, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Home Depot USA Inc, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Home Depot USA Inc, #5 Protective Order, #6 Electronic Filing Order. Signed by Clerk on 6/28/2021.(Gutierrez, Y.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/28/2021: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases) (Gutierrez, Y.).
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 6/25/2021.(Gutierrez, Y.)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 6/25/2021.(Gutierrez, Y.)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/24/2021; Discovery due by 12/25/2021; Dispositive Motions due by 1/29/2022. Signed by Clerk on 6/25/2021.(Gutierrez, Y.)
June 25, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC.. (Lapish, Caroline)
June 25, 2021 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by THE HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC..(Lapish, Caroline)
June 25, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Home Depot USA Inc., case number FBT-CV21-6107298-S. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACTDC-6557721, filed by Home Depot USA Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Lapish, Caroline) Modified on 6/25/2021 to correct pary (Anastasio, F.).
June 25, 2021 Judge Janet Bond Arterton added. (Anastasio, F.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chance v. Home Depot USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chance Roderick
Represented By: Patrick J. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roderick Chance
Represented By: Patrick J. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot USA Inc
Represented By: Caroline B. Lapish
Represented By: Kaitlin Kelly Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?