Tudor Insurance Company v. Ryan's Pub, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Tudor Insurance Company
Defendant: Raymond L. Ryan, Raymond L. Ryan, III, Ryan's Pub, LLC doing business as Ryan's Pub and Tammy De La Cruz
Case Number: 3:2021cv00876
Filed: June 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L Bryant
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Tammy De La Cruz(Administrator, Estate of Joseph Gingerella), Tammy De La Cruz(Individually).(Zrenda, Kyle)
August 10, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle Zrenda on behalf of Tammy De La Cruz(Administrator, Estate of Joseph Gingerella), Tammy De La Cruz(Individually) (Zrenda, Kyle)
August 10, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by John A. Collins, III on behalf of Tammy De La Cruz(Administrator, Estate of Joseph Gingerella), Tammy De La Cruz(Individually) (Collins, John)
July 16, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tudor Insurance Company. (Ahlstrand, Elizabeth)
July 16, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tudor Insurance Company. Ryan's Pub, LLC served on 7/13/2021, answer due 8/3/2021. (Ahlstrand, Elizabeth)
July 16, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tudor Insurance Company. Tammy De La Cruz (Individually) served on 7/8/2021, answer due 7/29/2021. (Ahlstrand, Elizabeth) Modified on 7/16/2021 to reflect correct defendant and to correct answer deadline (Peterson, M).
July 16, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tudor Insurance Company. Tammy De La Cruz(Administrator, Estate of Joseph Gingerella) served on 7/8/2021, answer due 7/29/2021. (Ahlstrand, Elizabeth)
July 16, 2021 Docket Entry Correction re #10 Summons Returned Executed - Modified docket text to reflect the correct defendant and updated answer deadline. (Peterson, M)
June 25, 2021 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Tammy De La Cruz(Administrator, Estate of Joseph Gingerella), Tammy De La Cruz(Individually), Raymond L. Ryan, Ryan's Pub, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Elizabeth F. Ahlstrand* *Gfeller Laurie LLP* *977 Farmington Avenue Suite 200* *West Hartford, CT 06107*. (Velez, F.)
June 25, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Tudor Insurance Company, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #6 Order Re: Chambers Practices, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, filed by Tudor Insurance Company, #5 Standing Protective Order, #4 Electronic Filing Order. Signed by Clerk on 6/25/2021. (Velez, F.)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 6/25/2021. (Velez, F.)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 6/25/2021. (Velez, F.)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 6/25/2021. (Velez, F.)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/24/2021; Discovery due by 12/25/2021; Dispositive Motions due by 1/29/2022. Signed by Clerk on 6/25/2021. (Velez, F.)
June 25, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tudor Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty Inc., Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty U.S. Inc., Corporate Parent American International Group, Inc. for Tudor Insurance Company. (Ahlstrand, Elizabeth)
June 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-6557867.), filed by Tudor Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ahlstrand, Elizabeth)
June 25, 2021 Judge Vanessa L. Bryant added. (Oliver, T.)
June 25, 2021 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Ahlstrand, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tudor Insurance Company v. Ryan's Pub, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond L. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond L. Ryan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan's Pub, LLC doing business as Ryan's Pub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy De La Cruz
Represented By: John A. Collins, III
Represented By: Kyle Zrenda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tudor Insurance Company
Represented By: Elizabeth F. Ahlstrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?