USA v. 535 Boxes of Counterfeit 3M 1860 and 1860S Face Masks et al
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: 535 Boxes of Counterfeit 3M 1860 and 1860S Face Masks
Claimant: Q2 Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00884
Filed: June 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Robert N Chatigny
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith Gregory on behalf of Q2 Solutions, LLC (Gregory, Keith)
August 25, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Derek Conor Flint on behalf of Q2 Solutions, LLC (Flint, Derek)
August 25, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Brett William Johnson on behalf of Q2 Solutions, LLC (Johnson, Brett)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to 10/22/2021 to respond to complaint. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 8/25/2021. (Rickevicius, L.)
August 25, 2021 Answer deadline updated for Q2 Solutions, LLC to 10/22/2021. (Rickevicius, L.)
August 19, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time until October 22, 2021 to Extend Claimant Q2 Solutions, LLC's Deadline to Answer the Complaint #1 Complaint by Q2 Solutions, LLC. (Williams, Tracy)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying #8 Motion for Default Entry 55(a) as Claimant Q2 Solutions has filed a Verified Claim of Interest. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 8/10/2021. (Rickevicius, L.)
August 6, 2021 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #14 MOTION for Attorney(s) Brett W. Johnson to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6600996) by Q2 Solutions, LLC. (Zeitlin, Andrew)
August 6, 2021 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #13 MOTION for Attorney(s) Keith M. Gregory to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6600993) by Q2 Solutions, LLC. (Zeitlin, Andrew)
August 6, 2021 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #12 MOTION for Attorney(s) Derek C. Flint to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6600980) by Q2 Solutions, LLC. (Zeitlin, Andrew)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro hac vice; granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro hac vice; granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro hac vice Certificate of Good Standing due by 10/5/2021. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 8/6/2021. (Rickevicius, L.)
August 4, 2021 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Q2 Solutions, LLC. (Zeitlin, Andrew)
August 4, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Attorney(s) Brett W. Johnson to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6600996) by Q2 Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration)(Zeitlin, Andrew)
August 4, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Attorney(s) Keith M. Gregory to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6600993) by Q2 Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration)(Zeitlin, Andrew)
August 4, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Attorney(s) Derek C. Flint to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6600980) by Q2 Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration)(Zeitlin, Andrew)
August 2, 2021 Filing 11 CLAIM Verified Claim of Interest by Q2 Solutions, LLC. (Zeitlin, Andrew)
August 2, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracy Ellis Williams on behalf of Q2 Solutions, LLC (Williams, Tracy)
August 2, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew M. Zeitlin on behalf of Q2 Solutions, LLC (Zeitlin, Andrew)
August 2, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Default Entry 55(a) as to Q2 Solutions, LLC by USA. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Request for 55(a) Default)(Nelson, David)
July 30, 2021 Filing 7 RETURN ON SERVICE by Publication filed by USA. Last publication date July 29, 2021. (Nelson, David)
July 22, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by USA (Nelson, David)
June 29, 2021 Filing 5 WARRANT of Arrest in Rem issued (Caffrey, A.)
June 28, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Standing Protective Order, #1 Complaint filed by USA. Signed by Clerk on 6/28/2021. (Agati, Kathryn)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 6/28/2021. (Agati, Kathryn)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 6/28/2021. (Agati, Kathryn)
June 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 535 Boxes of Counterfeit 3M 1860 and 1860S Face Masks, filed by USA.(Nelson, David)
June 28, 2021 Judge Robert N. Chatigny added. (Oliver, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. 535 Boxes of Counterfeit 3M 1860 and 1860S Face Masks et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Q2 Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Andrew M. Zeitlin
Represented By: Brett William Johnson
Represented By: Derek Conor Flint
Represented By: Keith Gregory
Represented By: Tracy Ellis Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: David Christopher Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 535 Boxes of Counterfeit 3M 1860 and 1860S Face Masks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?