City of Pontiac Police and Fire Retirement System v. McMahon et al
Plaintiff: City of Pontiac Police and Fire Retirement System
Defendant: Vincent K. McMahon, George A. Barrios and Michelle D. Wilson
Nominal Defendant: World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc
Case Number: 3:2021cv00930
Filed: July 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Referring Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER administratively closing case. In light of the parties' settlement in principle, the Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to administratively close this case. The parties have until September 17, 2021 to file a stipulation of dismissal or move to reopen the case. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 8/18/2021. (Castano, Nelson)
August 18, 2021 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Perez, J.)
August 17, 2021 Filing 44 Joint NOTICE by George A. Barrios, Vincent K. McMahon, Michelle D. Wilson, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc (Mueller, Jeffrey)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #42 Motion for Extension of Time until August 31, 2021. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 8/13/2021. (Shaffer, Chelsea)
August 12, 2021 Filing 42 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until August 31, 2021 for Defendants to file Their Opposition to #39 MOTION to Remand to State Court by George A. Barrios, Vincent K. McMahon, Michelle D. Wilson, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc. (Mueller, Jeffrey)
August 11, 2021 Filing 41 REPLY to Response to #13 MOTION to Dismiss Verified Complaint filed by George A. Barrios, Vincent K. McMahon, Michelle D. Wilson, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc. (Mueller, Jeffrey)
July 28, 2021 Filing 40 Memorandum in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Verified Complaint filed by City of Pontiac Police and Fire Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gregory M. Egleston in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Egleston, Gregory)
July 27, 2021 Filing 39 MOTION to Remand to State Court by City of Pontiac Police and Fire Retirement System.Responses due by 8/17/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Egleston, Gregory)
July 16, 2021 Filing 38 NOTICE by George A. Barrios, Vincent K. McMahon, Michelle D. Wilson, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc Notice of Filing of Notice of Related Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Related Cases)(Mueller, Jeffrey)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 7/9/2021.(Perez, J.)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Victor A. Bolden for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 7/9/21. (Barry, Donna)
July 9, 2021 Filing 35 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #7 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jerry S. McDevitt to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number BCTDC-6568614) by George A. Barrios, Vincent K. McMahon, Michelle D. Wilson, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc. (Mueller, Jeffrey)
July 8, 2021 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Stachel on behalf of George A. Barrios, Vincent K. McMahon, Michelle D. Wilson, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc (Stachel, Matthew)
July 8, 2021 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Anderson on behalf of George A. Barrios, Vincent K. McMahon, Michelle D. Wilson, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc (Anderson, Justin)
July 8, 2021 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Tarlowe on behalf of George A. Barrios, Vincent K. McMahon, Michelle D. Wilson, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc (Tarlowe, Richard)
July 8, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J. Kramer on behalf of George A. Barrios, Vincent K. McMahon, Michelle D. Wilson, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc (Kramer, Daniel)
July 8, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore V. Wells, Jr on behalf of George A. Barrios, Vincent K. McMahon, Michelle D. Wilson, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc (Wells, Theodore)
July 8, 2021 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #11 MOTION for Attorney(s) Richard C. Tarlowe to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6568778) by George A. Barrios, Vincent K. McMahon, Michelle D. Wilson, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc. (Mueller, Jeffrey)
July 8, 2021 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #12 MOTION for Attorney(s) Matthew D. Stachel to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6568799) by George A. Barrios, Vincent K. McMahon, Michelle D. Wilson, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc. (Mueller, Jeffrey)
July 8, 2021 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #10 MOTION for Attorney(s) Justin Anderson to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6568748) by George A. Barrios, Vincent K. McMahon, Michelle D. Wilson, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc. (Mueller, Jeffrey)
July 8, 2021 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #9 MOTION for Attorney(s) Daniel J. Kramer to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6568734) by George A. Barrios, Vincent K. McMahon, Michelle D. Wilson, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc. (Mueller, Jeffrey)
July 8, 2021 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #8 MOTION for Attorney(s) Theodore V. Wells, Jr. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6568717) by George A. Barrios, Vincent K. McMahon, Michelle D. Wilson, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc. (Mueller, Jeffrey)
July 8, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Jerry S. McDevitt on behalf of George A. Barrios, Vincent K. McMahon, Michelle D. Wilson, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc (McDevitt, Jerry)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Attorney Matthew D. Stachel to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 9/6/2021. Signed by Clerk on 7/8/2021. (Freberg, B)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Attorney Richard C. Tarlowe to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 9/6/2021. Signed by Clerk on 7/8/2021. (Freberg, B)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Attorney Justin Anderson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 9/6/2021. Signed by Clerk on 7/8/2021. (Freberg, B)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Attorney Daniel J. Kramer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 9/6/2021. Signed by Clerk on 7/8/2021. (Freberg, B)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Attorney Theodore V. Wells, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 9/6/2021. Signed by Clerk on 7/8/2021. (Freberg, B)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Attorney Jerry S. McDevitt to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 9/6/2021. Signed by Clerk on 7/8/2021. (Freberg, B)
July 8, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #12 MOTION for Attorney(s) Matthew D. Stachel to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6568799) filed by Vincent K. McMahon, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc, Michelle D. Wilson, George A. Barrios, #9 MOTION for Attorney(s) Daniel J. Kramer to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6568734) filed by Vincent K. McMahon, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc, Michelle D. Wilson, George A. Barrios, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Vincent K. McMahon, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc, Michelle D. Wilson, George A. Barrios, #4 Notice of Related Case filed by Vincent K. McMahon, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc, Michelle D. Wilson, George A. Barrios, #10 MOTION for Attorney(s) Justin Anderson to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6568748) filed by Vincent K. McMahon, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc, Michelle D. Wilson, George A. Barrios, #13 MOTION to Dismiss Verified Complaint filed by Vincent K. McMahon, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc, Michelle D. Wilson, George A. Barrios, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Vincent K. McMahon, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc, Michelle D. Wilson, George A. Barrios, #7 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jerry S. McDevitt to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number BCTDC-6568614) filed by Vincent K. McMahon, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc, Michelle D. Wilson, George A. Barrios, #15 Electronic Filing Order, #5 Notice (Other) filed by Vincent K. McMahon, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc, Michelle D. Wilson, George A. Barrios, #11 MOTION for Attorney(s) Richard C. Tarlowe to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6568778) filed by Vincent K. McMahon, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc, Michelle D. Wilson, George A. Barrios, #14 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #8 MOTION for Attorney(s) Theodore V. Wells, Jr. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6568717) filed by Vincent K. McMahon, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc, Michelle D. Wilson, George A. Barrios, #16 Protective Order, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc, #6 Notice (Other) filed by Vincent K. McMahon, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc, Michelle D. Wilson, George A. Barrios Signed by Clerk on 7/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases)(Freberg, B)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 7/7/2021.(Freberg, B)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 7/7/2021.(Freberg, B)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/5/2021; Discovery due by 1/6/2022; Dispositive Motions due by 2/10/2022. Signed by Clerk on 7/7/2021.(Freberg, B)
July 7, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Verified Complaint by George A. Barrios, Vincent K. McMahon, Michelle D. Wilson, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc.Responses due by 7/28/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Matthew D. Stachel, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8)(Mueller, Jeffrey)
July 7, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Attorney(s) Matthew D. Stachel to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6568799) by George A. Barrios, Vincent K. McMahon, Michelle D. Wilson, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mueller, Jeffrey)
July 7, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Attorney(s) Richard C. Tarlowe to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6568778) by George A. Barrios, Vincent K. McMahon, Michelle D. Wilson, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mueller, Jeffrey)
July 7, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Attorney(s) Justin Anderson to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6568748) by George A. Barrios, Vincent K. McMahon, Michelle D. Wilson, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mueller, Jeffrey)
July 7, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Attorney(s) Daniel J. Kramer to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6568734) by George A. Barrios, Vincent K. McMahon, Michelle D. Wilson, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mueller, Jeffrey)
July 7, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Attorney(s) Theodore V. Wells, Jr. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6568717) by George A. Barrios, Vincent K. McMahon, Michelle D. Wilson, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mueller, Jeffrey)
July 7, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jerry S. McDevitt to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number BCTDC-6568614) by George A. Barrios, Vincent K. McMahon, Michelle D. Wilson, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mueller, Jeffrey)
July 7, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE by George A. Barrios, Vincent K. McMahon, Michelle D. Wilson, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc Statement Pursuant to Standing Order (Mueller, Jeffrey)
July 7, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE by George A. Barrios, Vincent K. McMahon, Michelle D. Wilson, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc Notice of Pending Motions (Mueller, Jeffrey)
July 7, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Case by George A. Barrios, Vincent K. McMahon, Michelle D. Wilson, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc (Mueller, Jeffrey)
July 7, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc. (Mueller, Jeffrey)
July 7, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Mueller on behalf of George A. Barrios, Vincent K. McMahon, Michelle D. Wilson, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc (Mueller, Jeffrey)
July 7, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by George A. Barrios, Vincent K. McMahon, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc, Michelle D. Wilson from Superior, case number FST-CV-21-6052099. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACTDC-6568451, filed by George A. Barrios, Vincent K. McMahon, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc, Michelle D. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Mueller, Jeffrey)
July 7, 2021 Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer added. (Walker, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Pontiac Police and Fire Retirement System v. McMahon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Pontiac Police and Fire Retirement System
Represented By: Gregory Michael Egleston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent K. McMahon
Represented By: Jeffrey Mueller
Represented By: Jerry S. McDevitt
Represented By: Theodore V. Wells, Jr
Represented By: Daniel J. Kramer
Represented By: Justin Anderson
Represented By: Matthew Stachel
Represented By: Richard Tarlowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George A. Barrios
Represented By: Jeffrey Mueller
Represented By: Jerry S. McDevitt
Represented By: Theodore V. Wells, Jr
Represented By: Daniel J. Kramer
Represented By: Justin Anderson
Represented By: Matthew Stachel
Represented By: Richard Tarlowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle D. Wilson
Represented By: Jeffrey Mueller
Represented By: Jerry S. McDevitt
Represented By: Theodore V. Wells, Jr
Represented By: Daniel J. Kramer
Represented By: Justin Anderson
Represented By: Matthew Stachel
Represented By: Richard Tarlowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc
Represented By: Jeffrey Mueller
Represented By: Jerry S. McDevitt
Represented By: Theodore V. Wells, Jr
Represented By: Daniel J. Kramer
Represented By: Justin Anderson
Represented By: Matthew Stachel
Represented By: Richard Tarlowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?