Sarner et al v. Caldwell-Boyd et al
Plaintiff: Philip G Sarner and Emily Orbay
Defendant: Crystal Caldwell-Boyd, Jamel Caldwell and Choice Hotels International, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00987
Filed: July 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss Counts Nine and Four by Jamel Caldwell, Crystal Caldwell-Boyd.Responses due by 10/8/2021 (Miller, Josephine)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting Motion for Attorney Shanique D. Fenlator to withdraw as attorney (Doc. #16 ). Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 9/16/21. (Barry, Donna)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting Motion for Attorney Marc E. Finkel to withdraw as attorney (Doc. #15 ). Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 9/16/21. (Barry, Donna)
September 15, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Shanique D. Fenlator to Withdraw as Attorney by Choice Hotels International, Inc.. (Fenlator, Shanique)
September 15, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Marc E. Finkel to Withdraw as Attorney by Choice Hotels International, Inc.. (Finkel, Marc)
September 14, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffery P. Apuzzo on behalf of Choice Hotels International, Inc. (Apuzzo, Jeffery)
September 9, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Philip G Sarner, Emily Orbay. All Defendants. (Smith, Kevin)
September 9, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Philip G Sarner, Emily Orbay. All Defendants. (Pattis, Norman)
September 4, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Josephine S. Miller on behalf of Jamel Caldwell, Crystal Caldwell-Boyd (Miller, Josephine)
August 30, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Choice Hotels International, Inc..(Finkel, Marc)
August 30, 2021 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Choice Hotels International, Inc.. (Finkel, Marc)
August 23, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc Edward Finkel on behalf of Choice Hotels International, Inc. (Finkel, Marc)
August 23, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Shanique D Fenlator on behalf of Choice Hotels International, Inc. (Fenlator, Shanique)
July 21, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Jamel Caldwell, Crystal Caldwell-Boyd, Choice Hotels International, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Kevin Murray Smith* *Pattis & Smith, LLC* *383 Orange Street, First Floor* *New Haven, CT 06511*. (Freberg, B)
July 21, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Protective Order, #1 Complaint filed by Emily Orbay, Philip G Sarner, #3 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 7/21/2021.(Freberg, B)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 7/19/2021.(Freberg, B)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 7/19/2021.(Freberg, B)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/17/2021 Discovery due by 1/18/2022 Dispositive Motions due by 2/22/2022 Signed by Clerk on 7/19/2021.(Freberg, B)
July 19, 2021 Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer added. (Anastasio, F.)
July 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-6582462.), filed by Philip Sarner, Emily Orbay.(Smith, Kevin)
July 19, 2021 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Smith, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sarner et al v. Caldwell-Boyd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip G Sarner
Represented By: Kevin Murray Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Orbay
Represented By: Kevin Murray Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Caldwell-Boyd
Represented By: Josephine S. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamel Caldwell
Represented By: Josephine S. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Choice Hotels International, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffery P. Apuzzo
Represented By: Marc Edward Finkel
Represented By: Shanique D Fenlator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?