Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 3:2021cv00993
Filed: July 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.Responses due by 8/17/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(James, Jacqueline)
July 22, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC, #5 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Report on Copyright Form, #6 Protective Order, #1 Complaint filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC Signed by Clerk on 07/22/2021. (Peterson, M)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 07/20/2021. (Peterson, M)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 07/20/2021. (Peterson, M)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/18/2021. Discovery due by 1/19/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 2/23/2022. Signed by Clerk on 07/20/2021. (Peterson, M)
July 20, 2021 Judge Michael P. Shea added. (Anastasio, F.)
July 20, 2021 Filing 3 AO 121 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Copyright Form Completed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(James, Jacqueline)
July 20, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (James, Jacqueline)
July 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-6584533.), filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(James, Jacqueline)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Jacqueline M. James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?